Deramo v. American Airlines Group Inc
Plaintiff: Mark Deramo
Defendant: American Airlines Group Inc
Case Number: 4:2021cv01309
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Civil Case Terminated per #12 & DJ chambers. (sre)
December 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Complaint #3 filed by Mark Deramo. (sre)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: It is RECOMMENDED that United States District Judge Mark T. Pittman DENY Plaintiff's motions to proceed in forma pauperis. It is further RECOMMENDED that Judge Pittman inform Plaintiff that his complaint will be subject to dismissal without further notice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) unless Plaintiff pays to the clerk of Court the applicable filing and administrative fees of $402.00 within seven (7) days after his order. A copy of these findings, conclusions, and recommendation shall be served on all parties in the manner provided by law. Any party who objects to any part of these findings, conclusions, and recommendation must file specific written objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy. It is further ORDERED that the above-styled and numbered action, previously referred to the undersigned for findings, conclusions, and recommendation, be and is hereby, RETURNED to the docket of the United States District Judge. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 12/15/2021) (sre)
December 15, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Wed Dec 15 10:28:43 CST 2021 (crt)
December 13, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark Deramo. (sre)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Mark Deramo must address the following deficiency: Although Plaintiff filed a short form application to proceed in forma pauperis, he has not filed a long-form application to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 12/16/2021. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 12/2/2021) (sre)
December 2, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Thu Dec 2 10:24:55 CST 2021 (crt)
December 2, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Dec 2 12:26:27 CST 2021 (crt)
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sre)
December 1, 2021 Filing 7 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: Appropriate Staff Attorney. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (sre)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER transferring case to the Fort Worth Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Under the authority of Miscellaneous Order No. 6, this action is transferred to the Fort Worth Division, where venue is proper. See 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Plaintiff sues American Airlines Group Inc., which is headquartered in Tarrant County, Texas, within the jurisdictional boundaries of the Fort Worth Division. He complains of discrimination that occurred in part at DFW Airport, which lies partly in Tarrant County. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 12/1/2021) (chmb)
December 1, 2021 NEW CASE NUMBER 4:21-cv-1309 has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 3:21-cv-02960-E-BK. Future filings should reflect only the new case number and be directed to the proper division (see LR 5.1(a)). Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (rekc) NEF mailed on 12/2/2021. Modified on 12/2/2021 (sre).
December 1, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7,8. Wed Dec 1 14:11:10 CST 2021 (crt)
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark Deramo. (ygl)
November 24, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Amended Complaint by Mark Deramo. (ygl)
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against American Airlines Group Inc filed by Mark Deramo. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (ygl)
November 24, 2021 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ygl)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl)
November 24, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Nov 24 15:48:29 CST 2021 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deramo v. American Airlines Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Deramo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?