Lozano v Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Rosa Lozano
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 4:2021cv01365
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Cureton
Referring Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 8 Summons issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Summons and USM 285 forms hand-deliverd to USMS). (sre)
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Rosa Lozano. (Scoggin, Steven)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER PERMITTING FILING IN FORMA PAUPERIS, AND ORDER REGARDING COMPLETION OF SUMMONS AND ISSUANCE OF PROCESS: The above named Plaintiff is authorized to proceed with the commencement of this civil suit without prepayment of fees or the necessity of giving security therefor, such that the motion/application to proceed in forma pauperis [docket no. #2 ] be, and is hereby, GRANTED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 1/3/2022) (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) USM 285, #2 Additional Page(s) Summons Forms) (bdb)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton preliminarily assigned. File to: appropriate staff attorney. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. (bdb)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Rosa Lozano. (Scoggin, Steven) ***(Clerk's Note: No summons issued at this time - Motion for IFP pending)*** Modified on 12/22/2021 (bdb).
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rosa Lozano. (Scoggin, Steven)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rosa Lozano with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Scoggin, Steven)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rosa Lozano filed by Rosa Lozano. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Scoggin, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lozano v Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Lozano
Represented By: Steven R Scoggin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?