Bratu v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Veronica Bratu
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 4:2022cv00079
Filed: January 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Filing 9 Summons issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (sre)
March 17, 2022 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Veronica Bratu. (sre)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff shall pay the required $402 filing and administrative fees to the Clerk of Court on or before February 17, 2022. If she fails to do so, denial of leave to proceed in forma pauperis will be recommended, and this case will be subject to dismissal without prejudice as provided by Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 2/3/2022) (sre)
February 2, 2022 Filing 5 ***Please Disregard - PDF removed - Document inadvertently filed in incorrect case*** Modified on 2/2/2022 (bdb).
January 29, 2022 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. File to: appropriate staff attorney. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (sre)
January 29, 2022 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Veronica Bratu (Heeps, Jonathan)
January 29, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Veronica Bratu. (Heeps, Jonathan)
January 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi filed by Veronica Bratu. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Heeps, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bratu v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Bratu
Represented By: Jonathan Alexander Heeps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?