Ross v. Association of Professional Flight Attendants et al
Plaintiff: Robert (Bob) Ross
Defendant: Association of Professional Flight Attendants, McGaughey, Reber and Associates, Inc., Julie Hedrick and Erik Harris
Case Number: 4:2022cv00343
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0401 Labor Management Disclosure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Filing 22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Heather Abreu (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12889331) filed by Robert (Bob) Ross (Phillips, Kerri)
June 10, 2022 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert (Bob) Ross re #1 Complaint,,,,, McGaughey, Reber and Associates, Inc. d/b/a (Phillips, Kerri)
June 6, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert (Bob) Ross re #19 Answer to Counterclaim Certificate of Interested Parties (Phillips, Kerri)
June 6, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Robert (Bob) Ross. Related document: #8 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, (Phillips, Kerri)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 AMENDED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER: the Court concludes that it should be and hereby is GRANTED. MRA's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED until June 30, 2022. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 6/2/2022) (mmw)
May 31, 2022 Filing 17 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Original Answer filed by McGaughey, Reber and Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment) (Rake, Michael)
May 27, 2022 Filing 16 Proposed Order re #15 ///First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by McGaughey, Reber and Associates, Inc. (Rake, Michael) Modified title on 5/31/2022 (mmw).
May 27, 2022 Filing 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by McGaughey, Reber and Associates, Inc. Attorney Michael R Rake added to party McGaughey, Reber and Associates, Inc.(pty:dft) (Rake, Michael)
May 25, 2022 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on McGaughey Reber and Associates, Inc. c/o Registered Agent: M.S. McGaughey. on 05/06/2022. (Phillips, Kerri)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William W. Osborne. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 5/24/2022) (mmw)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Margot A. Nikitas. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 5/24/2022) (mmw)
May 19, 2022 Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney William W. Osborne (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12835841) filed by Association of Professional Flight Attendants, Erik Harris, Julie Hedrick (Denison, Sanford)
May 19, 2022 Filing 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Margot A. Nikitas (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12835736) filed by Association of Professional Flight Attendants, Erik Harris, Julie Hedrick (Denison, Sanford)
May 16, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Association of Professional Flight Attendants, Erik Harris, Julie Hedrick. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Denison, Sanford)
May 16, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Erik Harris, Association of Professional Flight Attendants, Julie Hedrick. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Robert (Bob) Ross filed by Association of Professional Flight Attendants Sanford R Denison added to party Association of Professional Flight Attendants(pty:dft), Attorney Sanford R Denison added to party Erik Harris(pty:dft), Attorney Sanford R Denison added to party Julie Hedrick(pty:dft) (Denison, Sanford) Modified on 5/17/2022 (mmw).
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Erik Harris on 04/25/2022. (Phillips, Kerri)
May 6, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Julie Hedrick on 04/25/2022. (Phillips, Kerri)
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Association of Professional Flight Attendants on 04/25/2022. (Phillips, Kerri)
April 21, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Association of Professional Flight Attendants, Erik Harris, Julie Hedrick, McGaughey, Reber and Associates, Inc. (axg)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axg)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robert (Bob) Ross. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Phillips, Kerri)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Robert (Bob) Ross. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12766773) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Overpayment of Letter, #2 Exhibit(s) Confidential Memorandum, #3 Exhibit(s) Ross Arbitration Award Letter, #4 Cover Sheet) (Phillips, Kerri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Association of Professional Flight Attendants et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert (Bob) Ross
Represented By: Kerri Donnally Phillips
Represented By: Kerri Phillips
Represented By: Heather Abreu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Professional Flight Attendants
Represented By: Sanford R Denison
Represented By: Margot A Nikitas
Represented By: William W Osborne, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGaughey, Reber and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R Rake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Hedrick
Represented By: Sanford R Denison
Represented By: Margot A Nikitas
Represented By: William W Osborne, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Harris
Represented By: Sanford R Denison
Represented By: Margot A Nikitas
Represented By: William W Osborne, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?