Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited v. Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Plaintiff: Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited
Defendant: Christopher Steven Kirchner
Garnishee: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Counter Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 4:2022cv00861
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court herby ORDERS that this case is REMANDED to the District Court of Tarrant County, Texas. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/16/2022) (Attachments: #1 Remand letter) (mmw)
November 16, 2022 Civil Case Terminated per #15 ORDER. (mmw)
November 4, 2022 Filing 14 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited. (Hill, Donald)
November 2, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint,, filed by Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice., COUNTERCLAIM against The United States of America filed by Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated (Opitz, Justin) Modified on 11/2/2022 (mmw).
October 27, 2022 Filing 12 OBJECTION filed by Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Or, alternatively, MOTION for Judgment (Opitz, Justin)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Court therefore ORDERS Defendant to file a response to Plaintiff's #8 motion to remand on or before October 27, 2022, specifically addressing whether Kirchner's citizenship destroys complete diversity. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/20/2022) (mmw)
October 19, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated filed by Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hill, Donald)
October 14, 2022 Filing 9 Appendix in Support filed by Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Or, alternatively, MOTION for Judgment (Hill, Donald)
October 14, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Or, alternatively, MOTION for Judgment filed by Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Grant Remand, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment) (Hill, Donald)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) by October 19, 2022, Plaintiff file an amended complaint; and (2) within 14 days after Plaintiff files the amended complaint, but no later than November 2, 2022, Defendant file an answer or other response to the amended complaint. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/5/2022) (mmw)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Lead counsel for each party and any unrepresented party shall confer in a face-to-face conference as soon as practicable The Joint Report shall be filed on or before November 4, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/4/2022) (mmw)
October 3, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Opitz, Justin)
September 30, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Opitz, Justin)
September 23, 2022 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13172753) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Opitz, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited v. Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triple S Sports and Entertainment Group Limited
Represented By: Donald E Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Justin R Opitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Steven Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?