The Trade Group, Inc. v. BTC Media, LLC
Plaintiff: The Trade Group, Inc.
Defendant: BTC Media, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00555
Filed: June 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY filed by BTC Media, LLC re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Neely, E)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Appendix in Support filed by The Trade Group, Inc. re #12 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A through D) (Wheatley, Scott)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by The Trade Group, Inc. re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Wheatley, Scott)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ("Motion"). ECF No. #10 . Having reviewed the Motion, the Court concludes that expedited briefing by the Parties would assist in the efficient administration of justice. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant's Motion on or before July 12, 2023. It is further ORDERED that any reply to Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before July 17, 2023. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 7/5/2023) (fba)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BTC Media, LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Didier Lewis) (Neely, E)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint Joint Submission on Discovery Matters REGARDING CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER by The Trade Group, Inc.. (Wheatley, Scott)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Trade Group, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Wheatley, Scott)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case filed by The Trade Group, Inc. (Wheatley, Scott)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BTC Media, LLC filed by The Trade Group, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Declaration of Neeshu Hajra, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Invoice, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Invoice) (Wheatley, Scott)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that by June 20, 2023, Plaintiff file an amended complaint that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, and the undersigneds judge-specific requirements and within 14 days after Plaintiff files an amended complaint, but no later than July 4, 2023, Defendant file an answer or other response to the amended complaint. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 6/5/2023) (tjc)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Lead counsel for each party or designee attorney with appropriate authority and any unrepresented party (except for a prisoner litigant proceeding pro se) must confer ("Scheduling Conference") in an in-person, face-to-face conference as soon as practicable to (1) consider the nature and bases for their claims and defenses, (2) assess the possibilities for a prompt resolution of the case, (3) make or arrange for the disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1), and (4) prepare the joint report described below. As a result of the Scheduling Conference, counsel must prepare and submit a Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order ("Joint Report"). As a result of the Scheduling Conference, counsel must prepare and submit a Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order ("Joint Report") by June 26, 2023. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 6/5/2023) (tjc)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tjc)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BTC Media, LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Neely, E)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by BTC Medial, LLC. ($402 receipt ATXNDC-13788449) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Intersted Persons, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Neely, E) Modified on 6/5/2023 (mmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Trade Group, Inc. v. BTC Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Trade Group, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsey Marsh Brown
Represented By: Scott A Wheatley
Represented By: Elizabeth Walsh Pittman
Represented By: Sarah Jane Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTC Media, LLC
Represented By: E Sawyer Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?