Dukiti, Inc. v. Mid-Continent Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Dukiti, Inc. and Dikuti, Inc.
Defendant: Mid-Continent Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2023cv01217
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Before the Court is the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Joint Report for Contents of Scheduling Order (ECF No. #5 ), filed January 24, 2024. Having reviewed the same finding good cause therein, and noting the agreement of the parties, the Court determines that the Joint Motion should be and is hereby GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/26/2024) (wxc)
January 24, 2024 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Extend Time deadline to file Joint Report filed by Mid-Continent Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Blumberg, Heather)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/2/2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/5/2024) (wxc)
December 19, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather N Blumberg on behalf of Mid-Continent Casualty Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Blumberg, Heather)
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Mid-Continent Casualty Company. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-14222159) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C) (Cooper, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dukiti, Inc. v. Mid-Continent Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dukiti, Inc.
Represented By: Ed Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dikuti, Inc.
Represented By: Ed Huddleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Continent Casualty Company
Represented By: R Brent Cooper
Represented By: Heather N Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?