Exxon Mobil Corporation v. Arjuna Capital, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Defendant: Arjuna Capital, LLC and Follow This
Amicus Curiae: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Business Roundtable
Case Number: 4:2024cv00069
Filed: January 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY filed by Follow This re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss (Trosclair, Kenneth)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPLY filed by Arjuna Capital, LLC re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Miller, Matthew)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the Motion (ECF No. #32 ) is GRANTED, and the Amici Curiae brief submitted by the Chamber and Business Roundtable is deemed submitted and shall be considered part of the record in this matter. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/29/2024) (sre)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Business Roundtable, The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America re #32 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Business Roundtable as Amici Curiae Supporting Plaintiff Exxon Mobil Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Keller, Scott)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Business Roundtable as Amici Curiae Supporting Plaintiff Exxon Mobil Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Business Roundtable (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Brief Supporting Plaintiff Exxon Mobile Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order). Party The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Business Roundtable added.Attorney Scott A Keller added to party The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America(pty:am), Attorney Scott A Keller added to party Business Roundtable (pty:am) (Keller, Scott)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OBJECTION filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss , #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Rasmussen, Mark)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Before the Court are Defendants' identical Motions to Dismiss. ECF Nos. #22 , #25 . Having reviewed the Motions, the Court concludes that it would benefit from an expedited response. The Court therefore ORDERS that Plaintiff shall file a response to the Motions on or before February 21, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/14/2024) (sre)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:30. Wed Feb 14 09:53:30 CST 2024 (crt)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Follow This. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Trosclair, Kenneth)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cornish F. Hitchcock. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/12/2024) (jaf)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew E. Miller. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/12/2024) (jaf)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Veronica Renzi. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/12/2024) (jaf)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Follow This with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Trosclair, Kenneth)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14386079) filed by Follow This (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Cornish F Hitchcock added to party Follow This(pty:dft) (Hitchcock, Cornish)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arjuna Capital, LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Mortillaro, Ross)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Arjuna Capital, LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix in Support) (Mortillaro, Ross)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ross Mortillaro on behalf of Arjuna Capital, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mortillaro, Ross)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STATUS REPORT filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Rasmussen, Mark)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth Peter Trosclair on behalf of Follow This. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Trosclair, Kenneth)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Court instructs Plaintiff to file a status update to the Court on or before Monday, February 5, 2024, as to what outstanding claims or issues are before the Court in this action. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/2/2024) (sre)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14361758) filed by Arjuna Capital, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Matthew Edward Miller added to party Arjuna Capital, LLC(pty:dft) (Miller, Matthew)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Withdrawal re: #11 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff's Motion to Set Expedited Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Rasmussen, Mark)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14358061) filed by Arjuna Capital, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Renzi, Veronica)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ***DISREGARD PER ATTORNEY, SEE #15 FOR CORRECTED ENTRY*** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Veronica Mary Renzi on behalf of Arjuna Capital, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Renzi, Veronica) Modified on 2/1/2024 (saw).
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Noel John Francisco. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/26/2024) (jaf)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation re #11 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff's Motion to Set Expedited Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule (Rasmussen, Mark)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff's Motion to Set Expedited Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rasmussen, Mark)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Follow This ; served on 1/25/2024. (Rasmussen, Mark)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Arjuna Capital, LLC ; served on 1/22/2024. (Rasmussen, Mark)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14334256) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Attorney Noel John Francisco added to party Exxon Mobil Corporation(pty:pla) (Francisco, Noel)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brett A. Shumate. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/23/2024) (jaf)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14330362) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Attorney Brett Shumate added to party Exxon Mobil Corporation(pty:pla) (Shumate, Brett)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Arjuna Capital, LLC, Follow This. (sre)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Reed C. O'Connor recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Mark Pittman for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 4:24-cv-00069-Y. (bcr)
January 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre)
January 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Rasmussen, Mark)
January 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14327889) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Rasmussen, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exxon Mobil Corporation v. Arjuna Capital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Mark Waldemar Rasmussen
Represented By: Brett Shumate
Represented By: Gregg Costa
Represented By: Jonathan David Guynn
Represented By: David R Woodcock
Represented By: Megan Lacy Owen
Represented By: Noel John Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arjuna Capital, LLC
Represented By: Veronica Mary Renzi
Represented By: Matthew Edward Miller
Represented By: Ross Mortillaro
Represented By: Zachary Alexander Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Follow This
Represented By: Cornish F Hitchcock
Represented By: Kenneth Peter Trosclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By: Scott A Keller
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Business Roundtable
Represented By: Scott A Keller
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?