Wojtowicz v. Lubbock County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Don Wojtowicz
Defendant: Mental Health Technicians Star Medical, Corrections Officers "Jailors" and Lubbock County Detention Center
Case Number: 5:2019cv00150
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: D Gordon Bryant
Referring Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Authenticated Records from Lubbock County re: #14 received and maintained in the JGB's Chambers. (bmh)
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 Letter received from Lubbock County Sheriff's Office re: #11 Order Directing Full Payment as to Don Wojtowicz. (bdg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT filed by Don Wojtowicz re #1 Complaint. (zzm)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 PRISONER DOES NOT CONSENT by Don Wojtowicz to Trial by Magistrate Judge. (zzm)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR AUTHENTICATED RECORDS: It is therefore ORDERED that the officials listed in this order shall provide the Court with authenticated and verified copies of any and all records pertaining to the specific allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint. The records and executed Certification must be provided to the court on or before September 27, 2019. Clerk mailed a copy of this order and Plaintiff's Complaint to the above-listed addresses. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 8/28/2019) (bmh) Modified on 8/28/2019 (bmh).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO EXERCISE JURISDICTION: It is ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, Plaintiff must sign and date the attached consent form and return the completed form to the United States District Clerk, Northern District of Texas, Lubbock Division, within thirty (30) days from the receipt of this notice. Clerk mailed this notice, Lubbock Miscellaneous Order No. 14,and the attached consent form to Plaintiff. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 8/28/2019) (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Order No. 14) (bmh)
August 28, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13,14. Wed Aug 28 11:34:34 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr. for all further proceedings. Judge James Wesley Hendrix no longer assigned to case. This case shal1 hereafter be numbered Civil Action No. 5:19-CV-00150-BQ. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/23/2019) (krr)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PLRA FILING FEE ORDER: Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed informa pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915. Plaintiff will not be assessed an initial partial filing fee because he lacks the requisite funds in his prison account to pay an initial fee; however, plaintiff will be required to pay the full filing fee of $350.00 under the PLRA. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, if any, the agency having custody of Plaintiff shall deduct 20% of each deposit made to Plaintiff's inmate trust account and forward payments to the Court on a regular basis provided the account exceeds $10.00. The Clerk mailed a copy of this Order to the Inmate Accounting Office as well as Plaintiff. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/23/2019) (krr)
August 23, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11,12. Fri Aug 23 15:57:20 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff, Don Wojtowicz. (zzm)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF TRUST ACCOUNT by Don Wojtowicz TDCJ # 152303. (zzm)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pursuant to Special Order 3-331 the clerk is to reassign all cases assigned to Judge Cummings that do not appear on Exhibit A to the docket of US District Judge Wes Hendrix, and all such cases are to carry the suffix letter "H. "(The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/9/2019) (lrl)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF TRUST ACCOUNT by Don Wojtowicz TDCJ # 152303. (zzm)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING FEE DEFICIENCY ORDER: The Court finds that Plaintiff should, within twenty (20) days from the date of this Order, pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file with the Clerk a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement (or institutional equivalent) and a signed copy of the Authorization portion of the Certificate of Inmate Trust Account. Failure to file the required documents will result in a denial of in forma pauperis status and dismissal of Plaintiff's complaint for want of prosecution without further notice, unless the filing fee of $400.00 is timely paid. The Clerk mailed a Certificate of Inmate Trust Account and Authorization to Plaintiff along with a copy of this Order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/5/2019) (zzm)
August 5, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Aug 5 14:33:58 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE AND INSTRUCTION TO PRO SE PARTY (zzm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE NOTES: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zzm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF TRUST ACCOUNT by Don Wojtowicz TDCJ # 152303. (zzm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Don Wojtowicz. (zzm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Don Wojtowicz. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zzm)
July 31, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,4,5. Wed Jul 31 16:25:57 CDT 2019 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wojtowicz v. Lubbock County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mental Health Technicians Star Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officers "Jailors"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lubbock County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Wojtowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?