Ennis v. Biomet Orthopedics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Peggy Ennis
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, BIOMET MANUFACTURING CORP., BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC and ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00155
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Referring Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christina T. Natale. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/10/2019) (bmh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10249798) filed by Peggy Ennis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Natale, Christina)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court is advised by the Clerk of Court that Christina Natale, Esquire ("Counsel"), whose name appears on a pleading in this case, is not a member of the Bar of the Northern District of Texas. Accordingly, within 30 days of the date of this order, Counsel shall either (1) provide to the Court, and to the Clerk of Court, satisfactory documentation of Bar membership or (2) apply for membership in the Bar of this Court or for admission pro hac vice for this case. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/9/2019) (bmh)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Pursuant to Special Order 3-331 the clerk is to reassign all cases assigned to Judge Cummings that do not appear on Exhibit A to the docket of US District Judge Wes Hendrix, and all such cases are to carry the suffix letter "H. "(The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/9/2019) (lrl)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bmg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against BIOMET MANUFACTURING CORP., BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC. filed by Peggy Ennis. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10163857) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Merman, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ennis v. Biomet Orthopedics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIOMET MANUFACTURING CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Ennis
Represented By: Derek Shawn Merman
Represented By: Christina T Natale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?