Tidwell v. Texas Department of Criminal Justice et al
Plaintiff: Richard Tidwell
Defendant: Teresa S. Gomez and Texas Department of Criminal Justice
Case Number: 5:2019cv00179
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Richard Tidwell. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bmh)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Richard Tidwell. (bmh)
September 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Tue Sep 17 15:24:48 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice to Plaintiff's right to request appointment of counsel after the Court has completed screening of his case or should there be a material change of circumstances. The Court finds that Plaintiff's requests to amend his complaint #6 , #7 as described should be granted. Any future motions to amend or supplement the complaint must be accompanied by a complete amended complaint. (The requesting party must file the document with the clerk.) (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/17/2019) (bmh)
September 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Clerk mailed an application to proceed in forma pauperis and a certificate of inmate trust account and authorization to Plaintiff along with this Order. Tue Sep 17 11:22:16 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: The Court finds that Plaintiff should, within 20 days from the date of this Order, pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file with the Clerk the following: a signed form application to proceed in forma pauperis; a signed copy of the authorization portion of the certificate of inmate trust account. Clerk mailed an application to proceed in forma pauperis and a certificate of inmate trust account and authorization to Plaintiff along with this Order. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/17/2019) (bmh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, by Richard Tidwell. (krr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Richard Tidwell. (bmh)
September 4, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,3,4,5. Wed Sep 4 11:58:42 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bmh)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bmh)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Richard Tidwell. (bmh)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Trust Account by Richard Tidwell TDCJ # 1835060. (bmh)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Richard Tidwell. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tidwell v. Texas Department of Criminal Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa S. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department of Criminal Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?