NBIS Construction & Transport Insurance Services v. Kirby Smith Machinery Inc et al
Plaintiff: NBIS Construction & Transport Insurance Services a/s/o Exact Crane and Equipment Corp. and NBIS Construction & Transport Insurance Services
Defendant: Kirby Smith Machinery, Inc., Walters Transport Service, LLC, Kirby Smith Machinery Inc and Walters Transport Service LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00182
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the docket in this case, notes that Kirby Smith Machinery, Inc. is not in compliance with the local-counsel requirement set out by this Court's Local Civil Rules. Local Civil Rule 83.10 requires parties in civil cases to obtain local counsel, which is defined as "a member of the bar of this court who resides or maintains the attorney's principal office in this district and whose residence or principal office is located within 50 miles of the courthouse in the division in which the case ispending." Attorneys who seek to proceed without loca1 counsel must first obtain leave from the presiding judge. Id. Kirby Smith Machinery is therefore ordered to obtain local counsel or file a motion to proceed without local counsel by October 9, 2020. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/24/2020) (lkw)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall confer at a scheduling conference no later than 9/29/2020. The Joint Report shall be filed on or before 10/13/2020. See order for additional instructions. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/15/2020) (dsr)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walters Transport Service LLC. (McBrayer, Mark)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kirby Smith Machinery Inc. (Farris, Thomas)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Kirby Smith Machinery Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Thomas D Farris added to party Kirby Smith Machinery Inc(pty:dft) (Farris, Thomas)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Walters Transport Service LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Mark Whitney McBrayer added to party Walters Transport Service LLC(pty:dft) (McBrayer, Mark)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Walters Transport Service LLC ; served on 8/24/2020. (Bustos, Fernando)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kirby Smith Machinery Inc ; served on 8/25/2020. (Bustos, Fernando)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Samuel J. Pace, Jr.. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/21/2020) (bmh)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Samuel J. Pace, Jr. (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11102499) filed by NBIS Construction & Transport Insurance Services (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bustos, Fernando)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kirby Smith Machinery, Inc., Walters Transport Service, LLC. (bdg)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdg)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NBIS Construction & Transport Insurance Services a/s/o Exact Crane and Equipment Corp.. (Bustos, Fernando)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by NBIS Construction & Transport Insurance Services a/s/o Exact Crane and Equipment Corp.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11040832) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Bustos, Fernando)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NBIS Construction & Transport Insurance Services v. Kirby Smith Machinery Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirby Smith Machinery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walters Transport Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirby Smith Machinery Inc
Represented By: Thomas D Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walters Transport Service LLC
Represented By: Mark Whitney McBrayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NBIS Construction & Transport Insurance Services a/s/o Exact Crane and Equipment Corp.
Represented By: Samuel J Pace, Jr
Represented By: Brandon C Callahan
Represented By: Fernando M Bustos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NBIS Construction & Transport Insurance Services
Represented By: Brandon C Callahan
Represented By: Fernando M Bustos
Represented By: Samuel J Pace, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?