Perez v. Lamb County Sheriff's Office et al.
Plaintiff: Adrianna Perez
Defendant: Lamb County Sheriff's Office, Lonzo Caldwell, J. Molina, R. Shelly and Misty Diaz
Case Number: 5:2021cv00029
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: D Gordon Bryant
Referring Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Authenticated Records re: #8 received and maintained in JGB's Chambers. (bmh)
March 19, 2021 Filing 10 Mail returned as undeliverable. #8 Order received back from Adrianna Perez as RTS: Not Deliverable as Addressed; Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (bmh)
March 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE from Lamb County Sheriff's Office re: #7 Order Directing Full Payment. (bmh)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR AUTHENTICATED RECORDS: It is ORDERED that the entities and/or officials listed in this Order shall provide the Court with authenticated and verified copies of any and all records pertaining to the specific allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint and any amended complaint. The records and executed Certification must be returned to the Court on or before April 1, 2021. The Clerk mailed a copy of this Order and Plaintiff's Complaint and any amended complaint to the above-listed addresses. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 3/2/2021) (zzm)
March 2, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Tue Mar 2 09:42:58 CST 2021 (crt)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PLRA FILING FEE ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis #6 . Plaintiff will not be assessed an initial partial filing fee. Plaintiff shall pay $350.00, the balance of the filing fee, in monthly installments. Clerk mailed this order to the attention of the Lamb County Jail Inmate Trust Fund Department. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 2/18/2021) (bmh)
February 18, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Clerk mailed a copy of this Order to the Inmate Account office Thu Feb 18 10:13:19 CST 2021 (crt)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Adrianna Perez. (bmh)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lamb County Sheriff's Office, Lonzo Caldwell, Misty Diaz, J. Molina, R. Shelly filed by Adrianna Perez. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bmh) Modified text on 2/12/2021 (bmh).
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: The Court finds that Plaintiff should, within 20 days from the date of this Order, pay the filing fee of $402.00 or file with the Clerk the following: A signed application to proceed in forma pauperis; A certified copy of her inmate trust account statement; A signed copy of the authorization portion of the certificate of inmate trust account form; A complete amended complaint on the form provided by the Court. Clerk mailed an application to proceed in forma pauperis, a certificate of inmate trust account with authorization, and a prisoner's civil rights complaint to Plaintiff along with a copy of this Order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 2/5/2021) (bmh)
February 5, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Clerk mailed an application to proceed in forma pauperis, a certificate of inmate trust account with authorization, and a prisoner's civil rights complaint to Plaintiff along with a copy of this Order. Fri Feb 5 14:23:02 CST 2021 (crt)
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bmh)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Bryant (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Bryant). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bmh)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lamb County Sheriff's Office filed by Adrianna Perez. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bmh)
February 4, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,3. Thu Feb 4 09:01:04 CST 2021 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Lamb County Sheriff's Office et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamb County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonzo Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Shelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrianna Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?