Contreras v. Zeke et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Contreras
Defendant: NFN Taylor, NFN Watson and NFN Zeke
Case Number: 5:2021cv00038
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: D Gordon Bryant
Referring Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Now before the Court is a document filed by pro se Plaintiff Matthew Contreras, which the Clerk docketed as a Motion for Leave to Amend/Supplement. ECF No. #12 . The Court hereby GRANTS Contreras's request for a standard 42 U.S.C. 1983 form. The Clerk shall mail Contreras a prisoner civil rights complaint form reflecting the cause number of this action and titled Amended Complaint. Should Contreras choose to file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint and proposed amended complaint, he must do so within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. All other relief not expressly granted herein is DENIED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr. on 3/29/2021) (krr)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. The Clerk mailed to Plaintiff a Civil Rights Complaint Form titled Amended and reflecting the cause number of this Action along with a copy of this Order. Mon Mar 29 11:07:40 CDT 2021 (crt)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Authenticated Records RE: #9 ORDER received from Terry County and maintained in JGB chambers. (krr)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND/SUPPLEMENT #1 Complaint, filed by Matthew Contreras. (krr)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Mail returned as undeliverable RE: #9 ORDER FOR AUTHENTICATED RECORDS, which was received back from the JAIL ADMINISTRATOR - TERRY COUNTY JAIL as RTS - NO MAIL RECEPTACLE - UNABLE TO FORWARD. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (krr)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO EXERCISE JURISDICTION. It is, ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail this notice, N.D. Texas Miscellaneous Order No. 14, and the attached consent form to Plaintiff. It is, further, ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, Plaintiff must sign and date the attached consent form and return the completed form to the United States District Clerk, Northern District of Texas, Lubbock Division, within thirty (30) days from the receipt of this notice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 3/11/2021) (Attachments: #1 Misc Order 14) (zzm)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR AUTHENTICATED RECORDS: It is ORDERED that the entities and/or officials listed in this Order shall provide the Court with authenticated and verified copies of any and all records pertaining to the specific allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint and any amended complaint. The records and executed Certification must be returned to the Court on or before April 9, 2021. The Clerk mailed a copy of this Order and Plaintiff's Complaint and any amended complaint to the above-listed addresses. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 3/11/2021) (zzm)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9,10. Thu Mar 11 09:51:05 CST 2021 (crt)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr. for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings no longer assigned to case. This case shall hereafter be numbered Civil Action No. 5:21-CV-00038-BQ. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings on 3/10/2021) (krr)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PLRA FILING FEE ORDER: MATTHEW CONTRERAS shall pay $350.00 in monthly installments as mandated by the PLRA. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings on 3/10/2021) (krr) Modified text on 3/10/2021 (bdg).
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7,8. Wed Mar 10 11:07:01 CST 2021 (crt)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Certificate of Trust Account filed by Matthew Contreras, TDCJ #: 2319954. (krr)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Matthew Contreras. (krr)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING FEE DEFICIENCY ORDER: The Court finds that Plaintiff should, within twenty (20) days from the date of this Order, pay the filing fee of $402.00, or file with the Clerk the following: A signed Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; A certified copy of his inmate trust account statement. The Clerk MAILED an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and a Certificate of Inmate Trust Account and Authorization to Plaintiff along with a copy of this Order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings on 2/16/2021) (krr)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Tue Feb 16 12:55:57 CST 2021 (crt)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (krr)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (krr)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Matthew Contreras. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (krr) Modified text on 2/12/2021 (lkw).
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,3. Fri Feb 12 10:19:33 CST 2021 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. Zeke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Zeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?