Kyles v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Omar O'Shea Kyles
Defendant: Tina E. Patrick, Lubbock County Detention Center, Dixon Services Inc., Sabine East Texas Basin, LLC, Patrick Ishola, Theodore Lynn Hogan and Bobby Jones
Case Number: 5:2021cv00091
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SHOW CAUSE ORDER: Plaintiff has failed to comply with the prior Order. It is, therefore, ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days from the date of this Order to: (1) file the above document(s) marked with an "X" OR (2) file a sworn affidavit or unsworn declaration made under penalty of perjury; attach copies of any relevant consent forms or other supporting information toPlaintiff's sworn affidavit or unsworn declaration. The Clerk mailed to Plaintiff an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and a Certificate of Inmate Trust Account along with a copy of this Order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings on 5/26/2021) (krr)
May 26, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Clerk mailed to Plaintiff an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and a Certificate of Inmate Trust Account along with a copy of this Order. Wed May 26 10:41:35 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING FEE DEFICIENCY ORDER: The Court finds that Plaintiff should, within twenty (20) days from the date of this Order, pay the filing fee of $402.00, or file with the Clerk the following: A signed Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; A certified copy of his inmate trust account statement (or institutional equivalent); A signed copy of the AUTHORIZATION portion of the Certificate of Inmate Trust Account. The Clerk shall mail an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and a Certificate of lnmate Trust Account and Authorization to Plaintiff along with a copy of this Order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings on 4/21/2021) (krr)
April 21, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. The Clerk also mailed an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and a Certificate oflnmate Trust Account and Authorization to Plaintiff along with a copy of this Order. Wed Apr 21 13:09:44 CDT 2021 (crt)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bmh)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bmh)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Omar O'Shea Kyles. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bmh)
April 19, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2,3. Mon Apr 19 11:41:45 CDT 2021 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyles v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar O'Shea Kyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina E. Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lubbock County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixon Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabine East Texas Basin, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Ishola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Lynn Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?