Kuykendall v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Linda A. Kuykendall
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 5:2021cv00283
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: D Gordon Bryant
Referring Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed on 01/07/2022 as to United States Attorney's Office Norther District of Texas. (bdg)
January 7, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security ; served on 1/7/2022 as to Region VI, Social Security Administration, Office of General Counsel. (bdg)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 Summons along with USM 285 Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General and Revion VI, Social Security Administration. Clerk also provided the completed summons, Plaintiff's Complaint, a form to consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, and this Order to the United States Marshal (USM). (Attachments: #1 USM-285, #2 USM-285, #3 USM-285, #4 USM-285) (bmh)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER PERMITTING FILING IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE BY THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL: Plaintiff's request to proceed IFP #2 is hereby GRANTED. Clerk provided Form USM-285, the completed summons, Plaintiff's Complaint, a form to consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, and this Order to the United States Marshal (USM) for service upon Defendant. The USM shall, within 30 days effectuate service upon Defendant. Defendant shall file a written answer or other responsive pleading in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 11/19/2021) (bmh)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. It ORDERED that Howard D. Olinsky may represent Plaintiff without designating local counsel, subject to further order of the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 11/19/2021) (bmh)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Bryant preliminarily assigned. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr. (bmh)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Linda A. Kuykendall. (Olinsky, Howard)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Linda A. Kuykendall re #3 MOTION Waive Local Counsel (Olinsky, Howard)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION Waive Local Counsel filed by Linda A. Kuykendall (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Olinsky, Howard)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Linda A. Kuykendall (Olinsky, Howard)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Linda A. Kuykendall. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es) if the motion to proceed IFP is granted. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter to Clerk) (Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuykendall v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda A. Kuykendall
Represented By: Howard D Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?