Tiner v. Lubbock County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Thomas Tiner
Defendant: Lubbock County Detention Center
Case Number: 5:2022cv00137
Filed: July 11, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2022 Filing 10 Mail returned as undeliverable RE: #8 Order of Dismissal and #9 Judgment, which were received back from Thomas Tiner as RTS - Not in Jail. No address update from last filed document. The current documents have not been re-mailed. (krr)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in the Court's order entered today, it is ordered, adjudged, and decreed that this civil-rights complaint is dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/3/2022) (krr)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Because Plaintiff has not paid the filing fee and his current address is unknown, this case cannot proceed. As a result, the Court finds that the civil-rights complaint must be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. So ordered. Judgment will be entered accordingly. All relief not expressly granted is denied and any pending motions are denied. Plaintiff is admonished that if he refiles his complaint, he must file his complete complaint on the approved form and either pay the full filing fee of $402.00 or file an IFP application and a certificate of his inmate trust account. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/3/2022) (krr)
August 3, 2022 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9. Wed Aug 3 16:57:58 CDT 2022 (crt)
July 19, 2022 Filing 7 Mail returned as undeliverable RE: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party, and #3 New Case Notes; which were all received back from Thomas Tiner as RTS - "Not in Jail". No address update from last filed document. The current documents have not been re-mailed. (krr)
July 18, 2022 Filing 6 Mail returned as undeliverable RE: 4 ORDER AND 5 DEFICIENCY ORDER; which were received back from Thomas Tiner as RTS - "Not in Jail". No address update from last filed document. The current documents have not been re-mailed. (krr)
July 12, 2022 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Clerk mailed electronic notice order to Plaintiff. Tue Jul 12 13:03:05 CDT 2022 (crt)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. Plaintiff must address the following deficiencies: The complaint was not filed on the court-approved form and neither the $402 filing fee nor a request to proceed in forma pauperis was submitted. Therefore, by August 11, 2022 (30 days), Plaintiff is ORDERED to (1) file the civil-rights complaint on the approved form, and (2) pay the $402 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis on the approved form with the required certificate of inmate trust account. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this action under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Clerk will mail an application to proceed in forma pauperis, a certificate of inmate trust account with authorization, and a prisoner civil-rights complaint form marked "amended," to Plaintiff along with a copy of this order. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 7/11/2022) (chmb)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF JUDICIAL SCREENING AND STANDING ORDER: Judicial screening of this case is pending. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2); 28 U.S.C. 1915A(a). It is therefore ORDERED that (1) service of process will be withheld until judicial screening is complete, (2) no motions for appointment of counsel may be filed until the Court has completed the screening process, (3) all discovery in this case is stayed until an answer is filed or until further order, (4) no amendments or supplements may be filed without prior Court approval, and (5) any motion to amend the complaint must be accompanied by a complete proposed amended complaint on the required form. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff must promptly notify the Court in writing of any change of address. Failure to provide updated address information may result in the dismissal of the case under Fed. R. Civ. 41(b). (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 7/11/2022) (chmb)
July 11, 2022 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (lkw)
July 11, 2022 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (lkw)
July 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lubbock County Detention Center filed by Thomas Tiner. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (lkw)
July 11, 2022 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2, 3. Mon Jul 11 10:48:11 CDT 2022 (crt)
July 11, 2022 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Clerk mailed NEF to Plaintiff Mon Jul 11 14:42:19 CDT 2022 (crt)
July 11, 2022 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Clerk mailed NEF to Plaintiff along with a 1983 Complaint marked "Amended" the application to proceed in forma pauperis and certificate of inmate trust authorization form Mon Jul 11 14:46:21 CDT 2022 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiner v. Lubbock County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Tiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lubbock County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?