Griffin v. Furlow
Plaintiff: Jewel Griffin
Defendant: Cory Furlow
Case Number: 5:2023cv00016
Filed: January 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: D Gordon Bryant
Referring Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: It is ORDERED that Griffin shall have twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to file an amended IFP application that accurately and completely reports her financial situation, or she must otherwise pay the $402.00 filing fee. Griffin is further admonished that failure to comply with this Order may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed for failure to prosecute in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Clerk shall mail Griffin an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Long Form)(AO 239) along with a copy of this Order. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr on 3/22/2023) (lkw)
March 22, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Clerk mailed an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Long Form)(AO 239) along with Order Wed Mar 22 15:27:18 CDT 2023 (crt)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court is of the opinion that this case should be TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable D. Gordon Bryant, Jr., United States Magistrate Judge, for further proceedings. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge D. Gordon Bryant, Jr for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Sam R Cummings no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/8/2023) (lkw)
March 8, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Wed Mar 8 09:21:13 CST 2023 (crt)
February 27, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jewel Griffin (bdg)
February 27, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cory Furlow filed by Jewel Griffin. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bdg)
January 25, 2023 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (lkw)
January 25, 2023 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (lkw)
January 25, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION (Application) To Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jewel Griffin (lkw)
January 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cory Furlow filed by Jewel Griffin. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (lkw)
January 25, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,3,4. Wed Jan 25 16:04:21 CST 2023 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Furlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewel Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Furlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?