Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company et al v. Llano Equestrian, LLC
Plaintiff: Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No. B0507RN2200289 and Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London
Defendant: Llano Equestrian, LLC
Counter Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Case Number: 5:2023cv00236
Filed: October 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order Joint Report by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (Strickland, Timothy)
November 22, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. Related document: 8 Counterclaim (Strickland, Timothy)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER:Lead counsel for each party shall confer at a scheduling conference, as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than 11/29/2023. The Joint Report shall be filed on or before 12/13/2023. Initial disclosures must be made no later than 14 days after the Rule 26(f) conference required by this Order. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 11/6/2023) (krr)
November 3, 2023 Filing 8 COUNTERCLAIM against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company filed by Llano Equestrian, LLC. See Docket #6 for image. (cea)
November 3, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Counterclaim filed by Llano Equestrian, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Tyscott R Hamm added to party Llano Equestrian, LLC(pty:dft) (Hamm, Tyscott) Modified docket text and added parties on 11/22/2023 (cea).
October 18, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Llano Equestrian, LLC ; served on 10/17/2023. (Strickland, Timothy)
October 10, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Llano Equestrian, LLC. (bdg)
October 10, 2023 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdg)
October 9, 2023 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No. B0507RN2200289, Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (Strickland, Timothy)
October 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Llano Equestrian, LLC filed by Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No. B0507RN2200289. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-14088609) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Strickland, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company et al v. Llano Equestrian, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Timothy W Strickland
Represented By: Stacey T Norstrud
Represented By: Timothy T Pridmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No. B0507RN2200289
Represented By: Timothy W Strickland
Represented By: Stacey T Norstrud
Represented By: Timothy T Pridmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London
Represented By: Timothy W Strickland
Represented By: Stacey T Norstrud
Represented By: Timothy T Pridmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Llano Equestrian, LLC
Represented By: H Grady Terrill
Represented By: Tyscott R Hamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: Timothy W Strickland
Represented By: Stacey T Norstrud
Represented By: Timothy T Pridmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?