Bentz-Seiders et al v. Dollar General Corporation

Plaintiff: Alisha Bentz-Seiders
Defendant: Dollar General Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv00003
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings and Motions to join other parties due by 3:00 p.m. on 7/1/2019. Discovery must be completed and Motions in Limine filed by 3:00 p.m on 8/31/2020. Motions for summary judgment must be filed by 3:00 p.m. on 3/2/2020. Bench Trial set for 9/21/2020 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 216, 33 East Twohig Avenue, San Angelo, TX 76903-6451 before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/5/2019) (dsr)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney....Accordingly, Robert E. Valdez is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel for Defendant Dollar General Corporation. Jose Trevino, Jr. of Valdez & Trevino, is hereby SUBSTITUTED in as lead counsel of record for Defendant Dollar General Corporation. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/20/2019) (dss)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Agreed MOTION to Substitute Attorney,and Designate Lead Counsel added attorney Jose De Jesus Trevino, Jr, for Dollar General Corporation. Motion filed by Dollar General Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Trevino, Jose De Jesus) Modified on 2/19/2019 (dss).
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles Campbell. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 2/5/2019) (dsr)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9747151) filed by Alisha Bentz-Seiders (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Campbell, Charles)
January 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Dollar General Corporation (Valdez, Robert)
January 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Judgment Defendant Dollar General's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Dollar General Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B) (Valdez, Robert)
January 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 2. mailed to Attorney Adrian Crane at the address listed on the Original Petition. Tue Jan 15 08:49:53 CST 2019 (crt)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (dsr)
January 14, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dollar General Corporation. (See Doc 1-7 for image.) (dsr)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 35th Judicial District Court, Mills County, Texas, case number 18-12-7034 filed by Dollar General Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9706594) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Additional Page(s) Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E) (Valdez, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bentz-Seiders et al v. Dollar General Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisha Bentz-Seiders
Represented By: Adrian Lovell Crane
Represented By: Charles Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Corporation
Represented By: Robert E Valdez
Represented By: Jose De Jesus Trevino, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?