Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc. v. Pacific Summit Energy LLC
Plaintiff: Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc.
Defendant: Pacific Summit Energy LLC
Case Number: 6:2021cv00023
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James Wesley Hendrix
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order of Dismissal. Before the Court is the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Dkt. No. #34 . The Joint Stipulation is approved. It is ordered that all claims and counterclaims asserted in these proceedings are dismissed with prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. The parties shall each bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/20/2021) (pnp)
September 17, 2021 Filing 34 Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal) (Patrick, Justin)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFF'S DEADLINE TO FILE ITS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Before the Court is Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc.'s Joint Motion to Extend Plaintiffs Deadline to File Its Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Dkt. No. #32 . The Court, finding good cause for an extension of the deadline, grants the motion. It is therefore ordered that Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc. shall file a response to Pacific Summit Energy LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 26) by September 17, 2021. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 9/15/2021) (pnp)
September 10, 2021 Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Extend Time Joint Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Deadline to File its Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ross, Brian)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File It's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment #30 . It is therefore ordered that Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc. shall file a response to Pacific Summit Energy LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by September 10, 2021. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/30/2021) (pnp)
August 30, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION to Extend Time filed by Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davidson, Jacob)
August 19, 2021 Filing 29 Appendix in Support filed by Pacific Summit Energy LLC re #26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Pursuant to Dkt 28 by the Court (Nunnally, Kevin)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Notice of Deficiency: Before the Court is Pacific Summit Energys Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Dkt. No. #26 . Along with its motion, Pacific Summit filed an appendix under seal. Dkt. No. #27 . The cover sheet to the appendix states that it is [f]iled [u]nder [s]eal [d]ue to the [c]onfidential [n]ature of the [d]ocuments. Dkt. No. 26-1. But Pacific Summit did not file a motion to file the appendix under seal. Because Pacific Summit has not followed the rules for filing documents under seal outlined in the Courts Protective Order, the Court strikes the appendix. Additionally, the Court orders Pacific Summit to file its appendix unsealed or, if it wants to request that the appendix be sealed, as an attachment to a motion for leave to file it under seal by August 20, 2021. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 8/17/2021) (pnp)
August 13, 2021 Filing 27 ** STRICKEN PER DOC #28 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Pacific Summit Energy LLC (Nunnally, Kevin) Modified on 8/17/2021 (pnp).
August 13, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Pacific Summit Energy LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Appendix Cover Sheet - Appendix Filed Under Seal) (Nunnally, Kevin)
May 14, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Subpoena filed by Pacific Summit Energy LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Notice of Subpoena) (Nunnally, Kevin)
May 14, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Subpoena filed by Pacific Summit Energy LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Notice of Subpoena) (Nunnally, Kevin)
April 30, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc.. Related document: #12 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, (Ross, Brian)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Protective Order. Paragraph 12 was added by the Court, in place of the parties' proposed paragraph 12, to address filings that include materials designated by the parties as confidential. The last part of paragraph 11 was altered to account for changes to paragraph 12. The Court has also added or modified headings and modified portions of other paragraphs for clarification. See document for complete details of protective order. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 4/27/2021) (pnp)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 9/13/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2021. Initial Expert Designation & Report due by 10/18/2021. Responsive Expert Designation & Report due by 11/17/2021. Discovery due by 12/17/2021. Expert Objections due by 1/18/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 2/14/2022. Pretrial Disclosures & Objections due by 5/23/2022. Pretrial Order due by 5/23/2022. Exchange of Exhibits due 5/31/2022. Jury Trial set for 6/13/2022 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom C-216, 1205 Texas Avenue, Lubbock, TX 79401-4091 before Judge James Wesley Hendrix. See order for additional details. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 4/27/2021) (pnp)
April 23, 2021 Filing 20 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc.. (Davidson, Jacob)
April 22, 2021 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Pacific Summit Energy LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Nunnally, Kevin)
April 22, 2021 Filing 18 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order Joint Report for Contents of Scheduling Order by Pacific Summit Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Nunnally, Kevin)
April 20, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joe William Ross on behalf of Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc.. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Ross, Joe)
April 16, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Turner Ross on behalf of Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Ross, Brian)
April 13, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin David Patrick on behalf of Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Patrick, Justin)
April 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barrett H Reasoner on behalf of Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Reasoner, Barrett)
April 9, 2021 Filing 13 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #12 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Pacific Summit Energy LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B, #2 Exhibit(s) J) (Nunnally, Kevin)
April 9, 2021 Filing 12 Defendant's Original ANSWER to Complaint filed by Pacific Summit Energy LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc. filed by Pacific Summit Energy LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A (filed under seal), #2 Exhibit(s) B (filed under seal), #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J (filed under seal)) (Nunnally, Kevin)
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob M. Davidson on behalf of Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Davidson, Jacob)
April 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon S Archer on behalf of Pacific Summit Energy LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Archer, Brandon)
April 1, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pacific Summit Energy LLC. (Nunnally, Kevin)
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Pacific Summit Energy LLC. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Nunnally, Kevin)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Supplement it's Notice of Removal: Before the Court is Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Supplement its Notice of Removal #6 . The Court grants the motion. Pacific Summit Energy is therefore ordered to file an amended notice of removal with the updated attachments by April 2, 2021. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 3/26/2021) (pnp)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Notice of Removal filed by Pacific Summit Energy LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Proposed Order) (Nunnally, Kevin)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 Supplemental Document by Pacific Summit Energy LLC as to #1 Notice of Removal Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet. (Nunnally, Kevin) (Main Document 5 replaced flattened on 3/29/2021) (pnp).
March 25, 2021 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pacific Summit Energy LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Sumitomo Corporation for Pacific Summit Energy LLC. Refer to Doc. 1, Attachment 2 for image. (pnp) Modified text on 3/26/2021 (pnp).
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The parties are not in compliance with the local-counsel requirement set out by this Court's Local Civil Rules. Attorneys who seek to proceed without local counsel must first obtain leave from the presiding judge. The parties are therefore ordered to obtain local counsel or file a motion to proceed without local counsel by April 8, 2021. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 3/25/2021) (dsr)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party shall confer at a scheduling conference as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than April 8, 2021. The Joint Report shall be filed by 4/22/2021. See order for details. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 3/25/2021) (dsr)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (pnp)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Pacific Summit Energy LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11731354) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Interested Parties, #3 Exhibit(s) Original Petition) (Nunnally, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc. v. Pacific Summit Energy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob M. Davidson
Represented By: Brian Turner Ross
Represented By: John Allen Davis
Represented By: Joe William Ross
Represented By: Justin David Patrick
Represented By: Barrett H Reasoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Summit Energy LLC
Represented By: Kevin Knox Nunnally
Represented By: Brandon S Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?