Franciscan Alliance, Inc. et al v. Burwell et al
Plaintiff: |
Franciscan Alliance, Inc., Christian Medical and Dental Society, Specialty Physicians of Illinois, LLC, State of Texas, State of Wisconsin, State of Nebraska, Commonwealth of Kentucky, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin and State of Kansas |
Defendant: |
Sylvia Burwell and U.S. Department of Health and Human Services |
Intervenor_defendant: |
American Civil Liberties Union of Texas and River City Gender Alliance |
Case Number: |
7:2016cv00108 |
Filed: |
August 23, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Texas |
Office: |
Wichita Falls Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Reed C O'Connor |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
05 U.S.C. ยง 702 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 16, 2021 |
Filing
206
Memorandum Opinion and Order...Before the Court are Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief on Remand (ECF No. 200 ), filed May 14, 2021; Intervenors Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief on Remand (ECF No. 201 ), filed June 4, 2021; Defendants Supplemental Brief on Remand (ECF No. 202 ), filed June 4, 2021; and Plaintiffs Supplemental Reply Brief on Remand (ECF No. 203 ), filed June 18, 2021. Having considered the motion, briefing, and applicable law, the Court GRANTS the motion. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/16/2021) (wxc)
|
August 9, 2021 |
Filing
205
Memorandum Opinion and Order... Before the Court are Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief on Remand (ECF No. 200 ), filed May 14, 2021; Intervenors Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief on Remand (ECF No. 201 ), filed June 4 , 2021; Defendants Supplemental Brief on Remand (ECF No. 202 ), filed June 4, 2021; and Plaintiffs Supplemental Reply Brief on Remand (ECF No. 203 ), filed June 18, 2021. Having considered the motion, briefing, and applicable law, the Court GRAN TS the motion. The Court shall retain jurisdiction as necessary to enforce this order. Plaintiffs shall file any petition for attorneys fees and expenses by thirty (30) days after the final resolution of all claims, including any appeals. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/9/2021) (wxc)
|
October 15, 2019 |
Filing
175
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Putative Intervenors' Motion to Intervene (ECF No. 129 ) should be and is hereby GRANTED. The Court also finds that Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment an d Permanent Injunction (ECF Nos. 132 , 135 ) should be and are hereby GRANTED in part. The Court SEVERS Plaintiffs' APA and RFRA claims from their Title VII, Spending Clause, First Amendment, Tenth Amendment, and Eleventh Amendment claims. The Court ADOPTS its prior reasoning from the preliminary injunction (ECF No. 62 ) and now HOLDS that the Rule violates the APA and RFRA. Accordingly, the Court VACATES and REMANDS the Rule for further consideration. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/15/2019) (skg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?