White v. Texas State Representatives et al
Plaintiff: Patrick White, Sr.
Defendant: Texas State Representatives, Harris County, Texas City Officials and Wichita Falls, Texas City Officials
Case Number: 7:2018cv00146
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Wichita Falls Office
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 11 Correspondence to the Court filed by Patrick White, Sr. (skg)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action is DISMISSED as barred by the three strikes provision of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/3/2018) (skg)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, this action is DISMISSED as barred by the three strikes provision of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). See Adepegba v. Hammons, 103 F.3d 383, 388 (5th Cir. 1996). This dismissal is without prejudice to Plaintiff's right to reopen the case if he pays the $400.00 filing and administrative fees and files a motion to reopen within thirty days of the date of this order. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/3/2018) (skg)
October 3, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9, 10. Wed Oct 3 16:33:42 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (skg)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skg)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:18-cv-00727. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
September 18, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7, 8. Tue Sep 18 08:55:33 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: (1) Plf's #4 objection is overruled; (2) The magistrate judge's #3 recommendation is adopted; (2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas pursuant to 28 USC 1406(a); DIRECTING the clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/17/2018. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/18/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Case transferred to Northern District of Texas; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/18/2018.]
September 13, 2018 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker. Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case as referral judge. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/18/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 OBJECTION to #3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge by Patrick White, Sr. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/18/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 1406(a); Objections to R&R due by 9/4/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/17/2018. (wcl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/18/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Patrick White, Sr. (beh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/18/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Harris County, Texas City Officials, Texas State Representatives, Wichita Falls, Texas City Officials, filed by Patrick White, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Document)(beh, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/18/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Texas State Representatives et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas State Representatives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris County, Texas City Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita Falls, Texas City Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick White, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?