United States of America v. Cabelka et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Gary D. Larson, Jacqueline Kay Latimer and Larry Cecil Cabelka
Case Number: 7:2018cv00174
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:17. Tue Jan 29 11:51:06 CST 2019 (crt)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER LIFTING STAY: It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff has until February 28, 2019 to respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss and motions to amend their motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. #8 #12 ). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 1/29/2019) (skg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of United States' Notice of Appropriations re: #15 Order Staying Case,, Terminate Motions, filed by United States of America (Notinger, Ramona)
January 10, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:15. Thu Jan 10 16:08:02 CST 2019 (crt)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF CASE: Accordingly, this case is STAYED until further notice. The Plaintiff SHALL notify the Court as soon as the President signs legislation appropriating funds to the Department of Justice, and the stay will be lifted at that time. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 1/10/2019) (skg)
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay re #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct, #8 MOTION to Dismiss, #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct, #12 MOTION to Amend/Correct, #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States of America (Notinger, Ramona)
January 9, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Wed Jan 9 08:51:51 CST 2019 (crt)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE AND NOTICE OF OPTION TO CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/8/2019) (Attachments: #1 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE) (skg)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Larry Cecil Cabelka (trt)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Jacqueline Kay Latimer (trt)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Jacqueline Kay Latimer (trt)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jacqueline Kay Latimer (trt)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Larry Cecil Cabelka (trt)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (skg)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 New Case Notes: (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skg)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Notinger, Ramona)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff United States of America. (Notinger, Ramona)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Notinger, Ramona)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summonses to Larry Cecil Cabelka, Jacqueline Kay Latimer, and Gary D. Larson, Executor of The Estate of Gerald D. Larson filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Notinger, Ramona)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Opinion, #2 Exhibit(s) Deed) (Notinger, Ramona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cabelka et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary D. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Kay Latimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Cecil Cabelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ramona S Notinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?