Wade v. State of Texas et al
Plaintiff: Micky Dawn Wade
Defendant: State of Texas and Texas Department of Family and Protective Services
Case Number: 7:2019cv00017
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed by Micky Dawn Wade re: #7 District Court's Questionnaire. (skg)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DISTRICT COURT'S QUESTIONNAIRE TO PLAINTIFF: Responses due by 3/15/2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/13/2019) (skg)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING FEE ORDER: Plaintiff shall pay $350.00 in monthly installments as mandated by the PLRA. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/13/2019) (skg)
February 13, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6, 7. Wed Feb 13 16:49:34 CST 2019 (crt)
February 13, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4, 5. Wed Feb 13 09:08:12 CST 2019 (crt)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (skg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Micky Dawn Wade. (skg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT by Micky Dawn Wade. (skg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Micky Dawn Wade. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (skg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. State of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department of Family and Protective Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micky Dawn Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?