United States of America v. Primestar Construction Corporation et al

Plaintiff: United States of America and United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Clarence Dailey Electric, Inc.
Defendant: Primestar Construction Corporation and Developers Surety and Indemnity Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv00018
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Primestar Construction Corporation. (trt) (Main Document 13 replaced on 4/17/2019) (trt). (Main Document 13 replaced on 4/18/2019) (trt).
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to issue Order Entry of Default as to Primestar Construction Corporation filed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Clarence Dailey Electric, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Proposed Order Entry of Default) (Anderson, Matthew)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Report due by 5/6/2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/8/2019) (trt)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Developers Surety and Indemnity Company ; served on 2/22/2019. (Anderson, Matthew)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Primestar Construction Corporation ; served on 3/19/2019. (Anderson, Matthew)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Developers Surety and Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate AmTrust Financial Services, Inc. for Developers Surety and Indemnity Company. (Fitzgerald, Robert)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Developers Surety and Indemnity Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Robert M Fitzgerald added to party Developers Surety and Indemnity Company(pty:dft) (Fitzgerald, Robert)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Anderson, Matthew)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (skg) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/19/2019) (skg).
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skg)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by United States of America. (Anderson, Matthew)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue SUMMONS filed by United States of America. (Anderson, Matthew)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9787378) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Anderson, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Primestar Construction Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primestar Construction Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Developers Surety and Indemnity Company
Represented By: Robert M Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew D Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Clarence Dailey Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?