Roffman v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Kenneth G. Roffman
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 7:2019cv00058
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nancy A. Berryhill ; served on 7/8/2019. (skg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Summons issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. Clerk has emailed summons to USM for service. (skg) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/14/2019) (trt).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2019) (skg)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ray (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (skg)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Kenneth G. Roffman re #4 MOTION Waive Local Counsel (Olinsky, Howard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Waive Local Counsel filed by Kenneth G. Roffman (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Olinsky, Howard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kenneth G. Roffman. (Olinsky, Howard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kenneth G. Roffman (Olinsky, Howard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Kenneth G. Roffman. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es) if the motion to proceed IFP is granted. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter to Clerk) (Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roffman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth G. Roffman
Represented By: Howard D Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?