Gregory v. State of Texas et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Wayne Gregory
Defendant: Wichita County Jail, State of Texas, WFPD, MTC Corrections, Mark Ball and Lindsey State Jail
Case Number: 7:2019cv00067
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 Correspondence to the Court filed by Matthew Wayne Gregory. (skg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 Correspondence to the Court filed by Matthew Wayne Gregory. (skg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 Correspondence to the Court filed by Matthew Wayne Gregory. (skg)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Correspondence to the Court filed by Matthew Wayne Gregory. (skg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 Correspondence to the Court filed by Matthew Wayne Gregory. (skg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 Correspondence to the Court filed by Matthew Wayne Gregory. (skg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 Copy of page 3 from Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form filed by Matthew Wayne Gregory. (skg)
July 9, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Tue Jul 9 15:25:26 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FILING FEE ORDER: Plaintiff shall pay $350.00 in monthly installments as mandated by the PLRA. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/9/2019) (skg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence to the Court filed by Matthew Wayne Gregory. (skg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Correspondence to the Court filed by Matthew Wayne Gregory. (skg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 WCSO Inmate Grievance Form filed by Matthew Wayne Gregory. (skg)
June 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3, 4. Tue Jun 18 09:29:29 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (skg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Matthew Wayne Gregory. (skg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Matthew Wayne Gregory. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (skg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. State of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFPD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey State Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Wayne Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?