USA for the Use and Benefit of Global Finishing Solutions LLC v. Primestar Construction Corporation et al
Plaintiff: USA for the Use and Benefit of Global Finishing Solutions LLC
Defendant: Primestar Construction Corporation and Developers Surety and Indemnity Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv00091
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by USA for the Use and Benefit of Global Finishing Solutions LLC. (Beck, Bethany)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Report due by 9/23/2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/26/2019) (trt)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Developers Surety and Indemnity Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Curtis Hubbard added to party Developers Surety and Indemnity Company(pty:dft) (Hubbard, Curtis)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Primestar Construction Corporation. (Hubbard, Curtis)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Primestar Construction Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Curtis Hubbard added to party Primestar Construction Corporation(pty:dft) (Hubbard, Curtis)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Developers Surety and Indemnity Company ; served on 8/8/2019. (Thompson, Bethany)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (trt)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by USA for the Use and Benefit of Global Finishing Solutions LLC. (Thompson, Bethany)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by USA for the Use and Benefit of Global Finishing Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate CURRAN GROUP, INC. for USA for the Use and Benefit of Global Finishing Solutions LLC. (Thompson, Bethany)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Global Finishing Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate CURRAN GROUP, INC. for Global Finishing Solutions LLC. (Thompson, Bethany)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Global Finishing Solutions LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10156665) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Bethany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA for the Use and Benefit of Global Finishing Solutions LLC v. Primestar Construction Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primestar Construction Corporation
Represented By: Curtis Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Developers Surety and Indemnity Company
Represented By: Curtis Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA for the Use and Benefit of Global Finishing Solutions LLC
Represented By: D D'Lyn Davison
Represented By: Bethany Thompson
Represented By: Thomas J Walthall, Jr
Represented By: Bethany Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?