Brooks v. Allred Unit
Plaintiff: Donald Ray Brooks
Defendant: Allred Unit
Case Number: 7:2019cv00134
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Thu Jan 30 10:37:22 CST 2020 (crt)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time. Responses due by 2/10/2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/29/2020) (skg)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Extend Time filed by Donald Ray Brooks. (skg)
January 2, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Thu Jan 2 13:35:13 CST 2020 (crt)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time. Responses due by 1/23/2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/2/2020) (skg)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Order #6 filed by Donald Ray Brooks. (skg)
December 3, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Dec 3 16:22:47 CST 2019 (crt)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Donald Ray Brooks must address the following deficiency: Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint using the Court's prisoner civil rights form, naming an entity or entities amenable to suit, and stating all facts and circumstances upon which he bases his claims against each such Defendant. The Court's prisoner civil rights form is available through the law library of the prison unit in which Plaintiff is confined. Plaintiff shall write the case number, 7:19-cv-134-O on the first page of the Amended Complaint. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 12/24/2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/3/2019) (trt)
December 3, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue Dec 3 16:17:22 CST 2019 (crt)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Collection and Payment of Full Filing Fee. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall, when funds exist in plaintiff's inmate trust account or institutional equivalent, forward to the Court an initial partial filing fee of $5.00. Plaintiff shall pay $345.00 in monthly installments as mandated by the PLRA. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/3/2019) (trt)
December 2, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3, 4. Mon Dec 2 16:06:04 CST 2019 (crt)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (skg)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skg)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Donald Ray Brooks. (skg)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allred Unit filed by Donald Ray Brooks. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (skg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Allred Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ray Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allred Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?