Wade v. Wichita County Texas
Petitioner: Micky Dawn Wade
Respondent: Wichita County Texas
Case Number: 7:2021cv00001
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 OBJECTION filed by Micky Dawn Wade re: #12 Findings and Recommendations on Case. (trt)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATIONOF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: After considering the pleadings and the applicable legal authorities, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that United States District Judge Reed O'Connor DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for failure to exhaust state remedies. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 2/25/2021) (plp)
February 25, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Thu Feb 25 09:41:24 CST 2021 (crt)
February 9, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Tue Feb 9 12:40:55 CST 2021 (crt)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/8/2021) (trt)
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE to the court regarding filing fee filed by Micky Dawn Wade (trt)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Before the Court is Micky Dawn Wade's Notice to the Court (ECF No. #8 ) which indicates that Wichita County Jail officials have requested a copy of the Court's order directing him to pay the $5.00 filing fee in this action. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of the Court's order (ECF No. #7 ), along with a copy of this order to: Jill Gann Jail Administrator P.O. Box 8526 Wichita Falls, TX 76307 (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/1/2021) (plp)
February 1, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Mon Feb 1 11:42:47 CST 2021 (crt)
January 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE to the court filed by Micky Dawn Wade (trt)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Accordingly, the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. 4) is DENIED. Petitioner shall tender the $5.00 filing fee to the Clerk of Court by February 12, 2021. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/22/2021) (trt)
January 22, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Fri Jan 22 13:38:40 CST 2021 (crt)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 OBJECTION filed by Micky Dawn Wade re: #5 Findings and Recommendations on Motion re: #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Micky Dawn Wade. (trt)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Micky Dawn Wade. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that United States District Judge Reed O'Connor DENY Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ECF No. #4 . Furthermore, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that Petitioner be ordered to pay the $5.00 filing fee within twenty-one days of any order accepting this recommendation or some other reasonable time to be established by the Court, and, if he fails to do so, the Court should dismiss this action without prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 1/11/2021) (plp)
January 11, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Jan 11 11:45:22 CST 2021 (crt)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with resident account summary filed by Micky Dawn Wade (trt)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Micky Dawn Wade. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (trt)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (trt)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ray (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (trt)
January 8, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Fri Jan 8 14:36:46 CST 2021 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. Wichita County Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wichita County Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Micky Dawn Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?