Chowdhury v. Mayorkas et al
Petitioner: EBRAHIM CHOWDHURY
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M Jaddou, TED H. KIM, Merrick B Garland and Ted H Kim
Case Number: 7:2022cv00115
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Merrick B Garland, Ur M Jaddou, Ted H Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa)
November 22, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (tjc)
November 7, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ added as AUSA. (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa)
November 4, 2022 Filing 13 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (No magistrate judge assigned). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tjc)
November 4, 2022 Filing 12 Case electronically transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:22-cv-01766. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
October 25, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/23/2022, (ztth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]
October 25, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 8/29/2022; TED H. KIM served on 8/29/2022; ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 8/29/2022 (Kholodovsky, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]
October 25, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/24/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/23/2022. (Kholodovsky, Brian); Modified to correct date of service and answer deadline on 10/28/2022 (ztth). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]
October 25, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/29/2022. (Kholodovsky, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 11/3/2022. (dot) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Motion to Transfer Case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 24, 2022. (lcckk1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]
October 21, 2022 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case by MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, TED H. KIM, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to on 10/21/2022 (zjm). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]
October 3, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Time to effectuate service upon party due by 10/23/2022. (dot) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER regarding service of process. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 3, 2022. (lcckk1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/18/2022. (DM) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]
July 7, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, TED H. KIM, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]
July 7, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmh) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by EBRAHIM CHOWDHURY filed by EBRAHIM CHOWDHURY.(Kholodovsky, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]
July 6, 2022 Filing 2 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE with Corrected Civil Cover Sheet filed by EBRAHIM CHOWDHURY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Corrected Civil Cover sheet)(Kholodovsky, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The plaintiff was notified of errors in his #1 Complaint on June 22, 2022. Yet the plaintiff has not corrected the errors and has not sought leave for an extension of time to do so. The Court hereby ORDERS that the plaintiff shall, on or before July 6, 2022, SHOW CAUSE as to why the case should not be dismissed for failure to follow the Local Rules. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 29, 2022. (lcdlf1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]
June 22, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to brian@jeelani-law.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Signature on civil cover sheet does not match filing attorney. Please file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]
June 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, TED H. KIM, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9318129) filed by MD EBRAHIM CHOWDHURY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #5 Summons SUMMONS FOR U.S. ATTORNEY, #6 Summons SUMMONS FOR ATTORNEY GENERAL, #7 Summons SUMMONS FOR ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, #8 Summons SUMMONS FOR UR M. JADDOU, #9 Summons SUMMONS FOR TED H. KIM, #10 INDEX OF EXHIBITS, #11 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Kholodovsky, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/4/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chowdhury v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EBRAHIM CHOWDHURY
Represented By: Brian Jacob Kholodovsky, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Represented By: Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ur M Jaddou
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Represented By: Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TED H. KIM
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Merrick B Garland
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Represented By: Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ted H Kim
Represented By: Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ
Represented By: Benton Gregory Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?