Trevino v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Plaintiff: Albert Trevino
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates Trust, Series 2005-17 and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 1:2018cv00146
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 ***Terminated Initial Conference set for 11/06/18. Parties have submitted joint scheduling order. Pending ruling on Dft's motion to dismiss. Modified on 11/2/2018 (sespinoza, 1).
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 11/8/2018(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 Joint PROPOSED ORDER - Scheduling Order, filed.(Thomason, Joel)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by The Bank of New York Mellon, filed.(Thomason, Joel)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Albert Trevino, filed.(Warner, Larry)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Larry L. Warner as attorney in charge of Albert Trevino, filed.(Warner, Larry)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry L. Warner on behalf of Albert Trevino, filed. (Warner, Larry)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by The Bank of New York Mellon, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Thomason, Joel)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/6/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates Trust, Series 2005-17, filed.(Thomason, Joel)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cameron County District Court, case number 2018-DCL-04446 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20865461) filed by The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates Trust, Series 2005-17. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - List of All Counsel of Record, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #5 Exhibit E - TRO, #6 Exhibit F - Request for Citation, #7 Exhibit G - Certificate of Cash in Lieu of Bond, #8 Exhibit H - Citation to William D. Larew, Substitute Trustee, #9 Exhibit I - Precept to Serve TRO, #10 Exhibit J - TRO Resetting of Hearing, #11 Exhibit K - Motion to Withdraw Request for TRO, #12 Exhibit L - Cameron County Appraisal)(Thomason, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trevino v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Trevino
Represented By: Juan Angel Guerra
Represented By: Larry Logan Warner, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, Trustee for the Benefit of the Certificate Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates Trust, Series 2005-17
Represented By: Joel R. Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Represented By: Joel R. Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?