Hines v. Quillivan et al
Plaintiff: Ronald S. Hines
Defendant: Sue Allen, George Antuna, Carlos Chacon, Keith Pardue, Randall Skaggs, Sandra Criner, DVM Jessica Quillivan, Michael White, Samantha Mixon, Jessica Quillivan and Sandra "Lynn&quot Criner
Case Number: 1:2018cv00155
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ronald G Morgan
Referring Judge: Fernando Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Vacation Dates by Sue Allen, George Antuna, Carlos Chacon, Sandra "Lynn" Criner, Samantha Mixon, Keith Pardue, Jessica Quillivan, Randall Skaggs, Michael White, filed. (Biggs, Adam)
October 24, 2018 CONTINUATION OF ENTRY # 20 FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES.The Defendants shall file a responsive pleading no later than December 14, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants shall file a responsive pleading no later than December 14, 2018. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
October 24, 2018 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive PleadingMotions referred to Ronald G Morgan. by Sue Allen, George Antuna, Carlos Chacon, Sandra "Lynn" Criner, Samantha Mixon, Keith Pardue, Jessica Quillivan, Randall Skaggs, Michael White, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Biggs, Adam)
October 24, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Arthur Biggs on behalf of Sue Allen, George Antuna, Carlos Chacon, Sandra "Lynn" Criner, Samantha Mixon, Keith Pardue, Jessica Quillivan, Randall Skaggs, Michael White, filed. (Biggs, Adam)
October 16, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ronald S. Hines, filed.(Rowes, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2018 Filing 16 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Jessica Quillivan served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018, filed.(Rowes, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 Filing 15 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Sue Allen served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018, filed.(Rowes, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Sandra "Lynn" Criner served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018, filed.(Rowes, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Samantha Mixon served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018, filed.(Rowes, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Randall Skaggs served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018, filed.(Rowes, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Michael White served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018, filed.(Rowes, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Keith Pardue served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018, filed.(Rowes, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to George Antuna served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018, filed.(Rowes, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Carlos Chacon served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018, filed.(Rowes, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #2 Motion for Jeffrey T. Rowes to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #3 Motion for Andrew H. Ward to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/9/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 3, 2018 Summons Issued as to 1.) Sue Allen, 2.) George Antuna, 3.) Carlos Chacon, 4.) Sandra "Lynn" Criner, 5.) Samantha Mixon, 6.) Keith Pardue, 7.) Jessica Quillivan, 8.) Randall Skaggs, 9.) Michael White. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request 2 - Keith Pardue, #2 Summons Request 3 - Sandra "Lynn" Criner, #3 Summons Request 4 - Michael White, #4 Summons Request 5 - Samantha Mixon, #5 Summons Request 6 - Randall Skaggs, #6 Summons Request 7 - Carlos Chacon, #7 Summons Request 8 - Sue Allen, #8 Summons Request 9 - George Antuna)(Bidwell, Anna)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Andrew Ward to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald S. Hines, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/23/2018. (Bidwell, Anna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2018: #1 verified Pro Hac Application) (dbenavides, 1).
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Jeffrey Rowes to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald S. Hines, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/23/2018. (Bidwell, Anna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2018: #1 verified pro hac application) (dbenavides, 1).
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20993554) filed by Ronald S. Hines. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7, #9 Exhibit Ex. 8, #10 Exhibit Ex. 9, #11 Exhibit Ex. 10, #12 Exhibit Ex. 11, #13 Exhibit Ex. 12, #14 Exhibit Ex. 13, #15 Exhibit Ex. 14)(Bidwell, Anna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. Quillivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald S. Hines
Represented By: Anna Aleksadrovna Bidwell
Represented By: Jeffrey T Rowes
Represented By: Andrew H Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Allen
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Antuna
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Chacon
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Pardue
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Skaggs
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Criner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVM Jessica Quillivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael White
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Mixon
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Quillivan
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra "Lynn&quot Criner
Represented By: Adam Arthur Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?