Ramos v. Hyundai Motor America

Plaintiff: Irma Ramos
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Case Number: 1:2018cv00176
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Referring Judge: Ignacio Torteya
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Hyundai Motor America, filed.(Aldape, Daniela)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dwight E. Jefferson on behalf of Irma Ramos, filed. (Jefferson, Dwight)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Daniela Aldape to Appear as at Initial Pretrial ConferenceMotions referred to Ignacio Torteya, III. by Hyundai Motor America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aldape, Daniela)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Initial Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya III(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya III(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 Sealed Event, filed.
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cameron County District Court, case number 2018-DCL-05716 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21204172) filed by Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Index of Matters Filed, #4 Exhibit A-1, #5 Exhibit A-2, #6 Exhibit A-3, #7 Exhibit A-4, #8 Exhibit A-5, #9 Exhibit A-6, #10 Exhibit B)(Aldape, Daniela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Hyundai Motor America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Ramos
Represented By: Dwight E Jefferson
Represented By: Willie D Powells, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Represented By: Daniela Gonzales Aldape
Represented By: David M Prichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?