United States of America v. 0.646 Acres of land More or less et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Tony Yzaguirre, Jr., Juan A Garcia, Berta Longoria Garcia, 0.646 Acres of land More or less, Ruth Garcia, Electric Gin Company of San Benito, Porfirio B Garcia and Estella G Gonzales
Interested Party: San Benito Bank & Trust Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00183
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Fernando Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss. It is ordered that defendant San Benito Bank & Trust Company is dismissed from this case.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
December 14, 2018 12 NOTICE of Disclaimer Executed by Cameron County Tax Assessor-Collector by United States of America, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kincheloe, Richard)
December 10, 2018 Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by United States in the amount of $25,584.21, receipt number BRO007112, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
December 10, 2018 11 Clerk's Receipt, filed.(dnoriega, 1)
November 26, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER granting #8 Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, it is: ORDERED that Defendants Juan A. Garcia, Estella G. Gonzales, Ruth Garcia, Porfirio B. Garcia, and Berta Longoria Garcia are DISMISSED from this case.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
November 21, 2018 9 MOTION to Dismiss San Benito Bank & Trust Company by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Kincheloe, Richard)
November 21, 2018 8 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Five Individuals by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Kincheloe, Richard)
November 13, 2018 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM, by United States of America, filed.(Kincheloe, Richard)
November 13, 2018 6 NOTICE in Condemnation (Amended) by United States of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Schedules)(Kincheloe, Richard)
November 13, 2018 5 DECLARATION of Loren Flossman (Amended), filed. (Attachments: #1 Schedules)(Kincheloe, Richard)
November 13, 2018 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Schedules)(Kincheloe, Richard)
November 13, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Kincheloe, Richard)
November 9, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/6/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(dbenavidesadi, 1)
November 9, 2018 1 Featured Case Order Severing Tracts RGV-HRL-4062 and RGV-HRL-4062-1. Accordingly the Court hereby grants the Unopposed motion to sever tracts RGV-HRL-4062 and 4062-1 from 1:10cv186 and Orders RGV-HRL-4062 and 4062-1, identified and described in the Amended Declaration of Taking attached to this Order as Exhibit 1, be severed into the new Civil Case 1:18-CV-183.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(dbenavidesadi, 1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2018: #1 Exhibit 1) (dbenavidesadi, 1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 0.646 Acres of land More or less et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Yzaguirre, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan A Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berta Longoria Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.646 Acres of land More or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Gin Company of San Benito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porfirio B Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estella G Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Richard A. Kincheloe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: San Benito Bank & Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?