Disability Rights Texas v. Leonhardt et al
Plaintiff: Disability Rights Texas
Defendant: Inspired Behavioral Health, Inc. and Brandy K. Leonhardt
Case Number: 1:2019cv00005
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed.(Mitchell, Beth)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service, filed.(Mitchell, Beth)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Disability Rights Texas, filed.(Mitchell, Beth)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/7/2019 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
January 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to 1.) Inspired Behavioral Health, Inc., 2.) Brandy K. Leonhardt. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons Requested)(Mitchell, Beth)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21611282) filed by Disability Rights Texas.(Mitchell, Beth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Disability Rights Texas v. Leonhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Disability Rights Texas
Represented By: Beth L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspired Behavioral Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy K. Leonhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?