Garcia Torres v. Davis
Petitioner: Jesus Garcia Torres
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Case Number: 1:2019cv00078
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ronald G Morgan
Referring Judge: Fernando Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER entered. The Court hereby ORDERS that, no later than September 16, 2019, the Respondent shall file the entire state record in chronological order, without duplication, including any and all records relating to Torres's trial, direct appeals, and state post-conviction proceedings, as well as any records concerning his incarceration. Each page of the record shall be Bates numbered. Furthermore, it is ORDERED that the Respondent shall file a response to the omnibus petition no later than September 16, 2019. The response shall cite the record using the Bates number. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 6/10/19 re: 12 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (EdnitaPonce, 1)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: #8 Motion to Deny Consent for U.S. Magistrate Judge to Proceed in Further Proceedings. The objection is overruled. The parties' consent to this referral is immaterial.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 Amended Petition against Lorie Davis et al filed by Jesus Garcia Torres.(dbenavides, 1)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 Certified Mail Receipt Returned re: 6 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (jtabares, 1)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to DENY CONSENT for Magistrate Ruling on case by Jesus Garcia Torres, filed. (rnieto, 1)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipt Returned re: 4 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ENTERED. Amended Pleadings due by 6/13/2019.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G. Morgan. Parties notified.(scastillo, 1) Modified on 5/22/2019 (scastillo, 1).
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jesus Garcia Torres, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2019. (dbenavides, 1)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Jesus Garcia Torres.(dbenavides, 1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia Torres v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesus Garcia Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?