Padilla v. Ditech Financial LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Padilla
Defendant: Julie Martin, Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing LLC and Ditech Financial LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00094
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ronald G Morgan
Referring Judge: Fernando Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ditech Financial LLC, filed.(Smith, Sam)
June 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr. Appearances: Richard J W Nunez, f/Plaintiff; Sam David Smith and Melissa Sue Gutierrez f/Defendant (Court Reporter: Sheila Perales) (Law Clerk: Luke Schamel) [Court Time: 1:26-1:41]. TELEPHONIC HEARING RE: REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER held on 6/13/2019. The Court addressed the parties. Plaintiffs counsel made his argument; Defendant's counsel responded; Defendant agreed to maintain litigation stop on any foreclosure proceedings against Plaintiffs until resolution of this litigation and, as a result, Court denied request for TRO and preliminary injunction as moot. Parties expressed their preference to have monies from state District Clerks registry moved into the registry of this Court; court instructed parties to file appropriate motion for the Courts consideration. (bespinoza, 1)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephonic TRO Hearing set for 6/13/2019 at 01:30 PM at by telephone before Judge Fernando Rodriguez Jr, filed. (bespinoza, 1)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cameron County, TX, case number 2019-DCL-03273 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22576918) filed by Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B")(Smith, Sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla v. Ditech Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Padilla
Represented By: Richard J W Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Sam David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Sam David Smith
Represented By: Melissa Sue Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?