United States of America v. Montero, et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Juan Montero and Antonia C. Montero, Antonia C. Montero and Juan Montero
Case Number: 1:2019cv00122
Filed: July 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Referring Judge: Ignacio Torteya
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Antonia C. Montero served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019, filed.(Cersonsky, M)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Juan Montero served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019, filed.(Cersonsky, M)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Cersonsky, M)
August 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to Antonia C. Montero. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(jdav, 4)
August 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to Juan Montero. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(jdav, 4)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya III.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
July 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Juan Montero and Antonia C. Montero filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cersonsky, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Montero, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Montero and Antonia C. Montero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonia C. Montero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Montero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: M H Cersonsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?