Herron v. FedEx Corporation
Plaintiff: Sonia Herron
Defendant: FedEx Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00136
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Referring Judge: Ignacio Torteya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting FedEx Corporation's Unopposed #13 Motion to Withdraw of Counsel and #13 Substitution of Attorney in Charge. Attorney Ashley Satterfield Patterson terminated. Joseph B Reafsnyder is hereby designated as Attorney-in-Charge for Defendant FedEx Corporation. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting FedEx Corporation's Unopposed #14 Motion to Appear Telephonically for the September 19, 2019 Show Cause Hearing.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION To Appear Telephonically for the September 19, 2019 Show Cause HearingMotions referred to Ignacio Torteya, III. by FedEx Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Billions, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Ashley S. Patterson to Withdraw as Attorney( Motion Docket Date 10/7/2019.), Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph B. Reafsnyder in place of Ashley S. PattersonMotions referred to Ignacio Torteya, III. by FedEx Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Billions, David)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Joseph B. Reafsnyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Joseph B. Reafsnyder to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Ignacio Torteya, III. by FedEx Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/2/2019. (Billions, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2019: #1 Verified Bar Membership Status for Motion Pro Hac Vice) (JenniferLongoria, 1).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, entered. Accordingly, Pittard is ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THIS COURT ON SEPTEMBER 19, 2019, AT 2:00 P.M. AND SHOW CAUSE regarding his failure to comply with the Court's orders, and his failure to prosecute this case on behalf of Herron. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/19/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya III (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(mperez, 1)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to Court from Sonia Herron, filed. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment) (dbenavides, 1)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER entered. The initial pretrial conference set for August 27, 2019, is CANCELED. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Courts Order Setting Conference. See Dkt. No. 2 at p. 2, 4. In all future proceedings, Plaintiff is ORDERED comply with the Courts orders, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(jtabares, 1)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by FedEx Corporation, filed.(Patterson, Ashley)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FedEx Corporation, filed.(Patterson, Ashley)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Ashley S. Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified. (rnieto, 1)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motions referred to Ignacio Torteya, III. by FedEx Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Billions, David)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Ashley S. Patterson to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Ignacio Torteya, III. by FedEx Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/15/2019. (Billions, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2019: #1 Verified Status of Bar Membership for Motion Pro Hac Vice) (JenniferLongoria, 1).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya III(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 107th Judial District of the State of Texas, Cameron County, case number 2019-dcl-03651-a (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22819712) filed by FedEx Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Billions, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herron v. FedEx Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Corporation
Represented By: Joseph B Reafsnyder
Represented By: Ashley Satterfield Patterson
Represented By: David Billions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Herron
Represented By: Robert Christan Pittard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?