Amara San Antonio, LLC v. Fourth Quarter Properties LXIV LP et al
Plaintiff: Amara San Antonio, LLC
Defendant: Stanley E Thomas and Fourth Quarter Properties LXIV, LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00153
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ronald G Morgan
Referring Judge: Fernando Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Fourth Quarter Properties LXIV, LP served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019, filed.(Sanchez, Dennis)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
August 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to 1.) Fourth Quarter Properties LXIV, LP, 2.) Stanley E Thomas. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Fourth Quarter Properties LXIV, LP, Stanley E Thomas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(Sanchez, Dennis)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fourth Quarter Properties LXIV, LP, Stanley E Thomas (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22924007) filed by Amara San Antonio, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Sanchez, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amara San Antonio, LLC v. Fourth Quarter Properties LXIV LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley E Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fourth Quarter Properties LXIV, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amara San Antonio, LLC
Represented By: Dennis M Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?