Sanchez Luna v. United States of America
Petitioner: Roman Sanchez Luna
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00188
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Referring Judge: Ignacio Torteya
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 10/11/2019 re: 3 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (dbenavides, 1)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Mail Receipt Returned, executed on 10/9/19 re: 5 Document(s) Sent - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (scastillo, 1)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III recused. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (rnieto, 1)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) as to Criminal Case No. 1:-06-CR-801 (Defendant No. 07) filed by Roman Sanchez Luna. (rnieto, 1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez Luna v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Appellate Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roman Sanchez Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?