Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement v. Rana
Petitioner: Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Respondent: Mohit Rana
Case Number: 1:2019cv00211
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Fernando Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Sealed Motion. It is ordered that Petitioner's motion to dismiss is GRANTED; and that Petitioner's claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk's Office is directed to terminate this case.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(dorinan, 1)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 SEALED MOTION To Dismiss by Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Masso, Nancy)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT Petitioner's Status Report by Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed. (Masso, Nancy)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service Executed as to Mohit Rana on 11/19/2019 re: Summons and Petition, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 14, 2019 Summons Issued as to Mohit Rana; delivered to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service.(bespinoza, 1)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 MOTION Issuance of Second Summons and Order Directing U.S. Marshal Office to Serve Summons.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(bespinoza, 1)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Issuance of Second Summons and Order Directing U.S. Marshal Office to Serve Summons and Petition by Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Proposed Order)(Masso, Nancy)
November 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to Mohit Rana c/o Preetkamel Singh; delivered to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service. (bespinoza, 1)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER regarding #2 SEALED EMERGENCY MOTION (Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(bespinoza, 1)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Summons and Order Directing U.S. Marshal Office to Serve Summons and Petition.(Signed by Judge Fernando Rodriguez, Jr) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Proposed Order)(Masso, Nancy) Modified on 11/13/2019 (bespinoza, 1).
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED EMERGENCY MOTION by Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 SEALED EMERGENCY PETITION by Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (JenniferLongoria, 1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement v. Rana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mohit Rana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Nancy Lynn Masso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?