Ochoa et al v. Cowan et al
Defendant: SCOTT WOLF, Robert M COWAN, William P. Barr, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Norma A Limon and Robert M. Cowan
Petitioner: Yessica P OCHOA, Luis Andrick OCHOA-Montero, Luis Alexander OCHOA-Montero and Yessica Paola Ochoa
Case Number: 1:2020cv00066
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Referring Judge: Ignacio Torteya
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order to Dismiss Case without prejudice. The Court Orders the District Clerk to Close this case.(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Discovery( Motion Docket Date 6/29/2020.), MOTION to Dismiss Complaint without Prejudice Motions referred to Ignacio Torteya, III. by Yessica Paola Ochoa, Luis Andrick Ochoa-Montero, Luis Alexander Ochoa-Montero, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Diez, Jaime)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/20/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya III(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to 1.) William P. Barr, 2.) Robert M. Cowan, 3.) Norma A Limon, 4.) United States of America, 5.) Scott Wolf. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Diez, Jaime)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBITS by Yessica P OCHOA, Luis Alexander OCHOA-Montero, Luis Andrick OCHOA-Montero, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Diez, Jaime)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0541-24611595) filed by Luis Andrick OCHOA-Montero, Luis Alexander OCHOA-Montero, Yessica P OCHOA.(Diez, Jaime)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ochoa et al v. Cowan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M COWAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma A Limon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yessica P OCHOA
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis Andrick OCHOA-Montero
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis Alexander OCHOA-Montero
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yessica Paola Ochoa
Represented By: Jaime M Diez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?