Bastan et al v. The Continental Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: HUGO BASTAN, DRAGADOS Y MANIOBRAS MARITIMAS DE TUXPAN SA DE CV and Dragados y Maniobras Maritimas de Tuxpan S.A. de C.V.
Defendant: JOHN UHR, BIZ ACTION INSURANCE AGENCY, UNDERWRITING ENTERPRISES, INC., SALIKHA BERKOVICH, Individually and d/b/a ABA INSURANCE AGENCY, THE CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, THOMAS PEPPER, RSG SPECIALTY, LLC (f/k/a RT SPECIALTY, LLC, RSG Specialty, LLC, Salikah Berkovich Individually doing business as ABA Insurance Agency and RT Specialty, LLC
Cross Defendant: Salikah Berkovich
Case Number: 1:2021cv00013
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Referring Judge: Ignacio Torteya
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Salikah Berkovich, Biz Action Insurance Agency, John Uhr, Underwriting Enterprises, Inc. by The Continental Insurance Company, filed.(Ortiz, Andrea)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Daniel M. O'Connell to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Kevin F. Buckley to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Daniel O'Connell to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Ignacio Torteya, III. by The Continental Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2021. (Ortiz, Andrea) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2021: #1 Verified Status of Bar Membership for Motion Pro Hac Vice) (scastillo, 1).
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Kevin Buckley to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to Ignacio Torteya, III. by The Continental Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/5/2021. (Ortiz, Andrea) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2021: #1 Verified Status of Bar Membership for Motion Pro Hac Vice) (scastillo, 1).
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 4/5/2021.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(dbenavides, 1)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' ComplaintMotions referred to Ignacio Torteya, III. by RSG Specialty, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer)(Compton, Katherine)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION re: Extending Time to Answer by The Continental Insurance Company, filed.(Ortiz, Andrea)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Conference. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya III(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified. (rnieto, 1)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 1.) Salikah Berkovich, 2.) Thomas Pepper, 3.) RSG Specialty, LLC, 4.) The Continental Insurance Company, 5.) John Uhr, 6.) Underwriting Enterprises, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint, #3 Complaint, #4 Complaint, #5 Complaint)(Sanchez, Dennis)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25897574) filed by HUGO BASTAN, DRAGADOS Y MANIOBRAS MARITIMAS DE TUXPAN SA DE CV.(Sanchez, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bastan et al v. The Continental Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUGO BASTAN
Represented By: Dennis M Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DRAGADOS Y MANIOBRAS MARITIMAS DE TUXPAN SA DE CV
Represented By: Dennis M Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dragados y Maniobras Maritimas de Tuxpan S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: Dennis M Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN UHR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIZ ACTION INSURANCE AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNDERWRITING ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALIKHA BERKOVICH, Individually and d/b/a ABA INSURANCE AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Daniel M O'Connell
Represented By: Andrea Ann Ortiz
Represented By: Kevin F Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS PEPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSG SPECIALTY, LLC (f/k/a RT SPECIALTY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSG Specialty, LLC
Represented By: Katherine A Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salikah Berkovich Individually doing business as ABA Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RT Specialty, LLC
Represented By: Katherine A Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Salikah Berkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?