Zabala Cubillan v. Pekoske et al
Petitioner: Mr. Douglas Ernesto Zabala Cubillan and Douglas Ernesto Zabala Cubillan
Respondent: Honorable Monty Wilkinson, Director Daniel Bible, DAVID PEKOSKE, Officer in Charge Melissa DeLeon, Acting Director Tae Johnson, Daniel Bible, Melissa DeLeon, Tae Johnson and Monty Wilkinson
Case Number: 1:2021cv00015
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Dismissing Petition as Moot. The Clerk of Court is ordered to close this case. Case terminated on 3/22/2021 (Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
March 8, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Daniel Bible, Melissa DeLeon, Tae Johnson, David Pekoske, Monty Wilkinson by Douglas Ernesto Zabala Cubillan, filed. (Pena, Laura)
March 2, 2021 Filing 16 SEALED EXHIBITS Gov't Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's release documents re: #15 Advisory by Daniel Bible, Melissa DeLeon, Tae Johnson, David Pekoske, Monty Wilkinson, filed. (Pineda, Christopher)
March 2, 2021 Filing 15 ADVISORY by Daniel Bible, Melissa DeLeon, Tae Johnson, David Pekoske, Monty Wilkinson, filed.(Pineda, Christopher)
February 19, 2021 ***Set/Reset Deadlines: Respondents to respond to the Petition no later than 3/12/2021. (rnieto, 1)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion. Respondents are ORDERED to respond to Petitioner's Petition #6 and show cause why the Petition should not be granted. This Court ORDERS Respondents to respond to the Petition no later than March 12, 2021 (Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified. (rnieto, 1)
February 19, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to 1.) Melissa DeLeon, 2.) Tae Johnson, 3.) David Pekoske, 4.) Monty Wilkinson. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation)(JenniferLongoria, 1)
February 19, 2021 Filing 12 Opposed MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to Writ of Habeas Corpus by Douglas Ernesto Zabala Cubillan, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/12/2021. (Pena, Laura)
February 17, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Monty Wilkinson, filed.(Pena, Laura)
February 17, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Issuance of Summons as to David Pekoske, filed.(Pena, Laura)
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Tae Johnson, filed.(Pena, Laura)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Melissa DeLeon, filed.(Pena, Laura)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Daniel Bible. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
February 13, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED PETITION against Daniel Bible, Melissa DeLeon, Tae Johnson, David Pekoske, Monty Wilkinson filed by Douglas Ernesto Zabala Cubillan. Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by Douglas Ernesto Zabala Cubillan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12 Part 1, #14 Exhibit 12 Part 2, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14)(Pena, Laura)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Daniel Bible, Melissa DeLeon, Tae Johnson, David Pekoske, Monty Wilkinson, Ryan K. Patrick, filed.(Pena, Laura)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM In Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Douglas Ernesto Zabala Cubillan, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Pena, Laura)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 Incomplete Service Letter by Daniel Bible, Melissa DeLeon, Tae Johnson, David Pekoske, Monty Wilkinson, filed.(Pineda, Christopher)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Pineda on behalf of Daniel Bible, Melissa DeLeon, Tae Johnson, David Pekoske, Monty Wilkinson, filed. (Pineda, Christopher)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0541-25948759) filed by Douglas Ernesto Zabala Cubillan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14)(Pena, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zabala Cubillan v. Pekoske et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Honorable Monty Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Daniel Bible
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAVID PEKOSKE
Represented By: Christopher D Pineda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Officer in Charge Melissa DeLeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Director Tae Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Bible
Represented By: Christopher D Pineda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Melissa DeLeon
Represented By: Christopher D Pineda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tae Johnson
Represented By: Christopher D Pineda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Monty Wilkinson
Represented By: Christopher D Pineda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mr. Douglas Ernesto Zabala Cubillan
Represented By: Laura Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas Ernesto Zabala Cubillan
Represented By: Laura Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?