Morato Martinez v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Plaintiff: Alma Rosa Morato martinez
Defendant: NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Sandra Mendoza and Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 1:2021cv00051
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #4 Opposed MOTION to Remand , filed by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McInnis, Walter)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Alma Rosa Morato Martinez, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/25/2021. (Guerra, Juan)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/13/2021 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, filed.(McInnis, Walter)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cameron Count- 404th District Court, case number 2021-DCL-02025 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26273377) filed by NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit Exh 1- Pltf's Original Petition & Request for TRO, #3 Exhibit Exh 2- TRO, #4 Exhibit Exh 3- Precept to Serve TRO (Sandra Mendoza- Sub Trustee), #5 Exhibit Exh 4- Issuance of Citaton (Sandra Mendoza-Sub Trustee), #6 Exhibit Exh 5- Certificate of Cash in Lieu of Bond, #7 Exhibit Exh 6- Def Shellpoint's Answer to Pltf's Original Petition, #8 Exhibit Exh 7- State Court Docket Sheet, #9 Exhibit Exh 8- Civil Case Coversheet, #10 Exhibit Exh 9- List of Attorneys, #11 Exhibit Exh 10- Cameron CAD Property Details)(McInnis, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morato Martinez v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Walter Lewis Edmond McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Walter Lewis Edmond McInnis
Represented By: C Charles Townsend
Represented By: Taylor Dominique Hennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Rosa Morato martinez
Represented By: Juan Angel Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?