Wilmington Trust, National Association et al v. Salazar et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association, not in its individual capacity, but solely as Trustee of BRAVO Residential Funding Trust 2019-2 and Wilmington Trust, National Association
Defendant: Rosa Espinoza, Rene Salazar, Dina Edith Hernandez and Ciro Hernandez
3Rd Party Defendant: United States of America on behalf of the Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2021cv00055
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Default Judgment against Rosa Espinoza, Rene Salazar by Wilmington Trust, National Association, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Danaher, Philip)
June 10, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST for Entry of Default against Rosa Espinoza, Rene Salazar by Wilmington Trust, National Association, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Danaher, Philip)
June 8, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Danaher, Philip)
May 21, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Ciro Hernandez, Dina Edith Hernandez, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/11/2021. (Nix, Angela)
May 20, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ciro Hernandez, Dina Edith Hernandez, filed.(Nix, Angela)
May 6, 2021 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by United States of America on behalf of the Internal Revenue Service on 04/28/2021 re: Original Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet, filed.(Danaher, Philip)
May 6, 2021 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by United States of America on behalf of the Internal Revenue Service on 04/26/2021 re: Original Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet, filed.(Danaher, Philip)
May 6, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to United States of America on behalf of the Internal Revenue Service served on 4/29/2021, answer due 6/28/2021, filed.(Danaher, Philip)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Ciro Hernandez served on 4/24/2021, answer due 5/17/2021, filed.(Danaher, Philip)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of Service, filed.(Danaher, Philip)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Dina Edith Hernandez served on 4/24/2021, answer due 5/17/2021, filed.(Danaher, Philip)
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Rosa Espinoza served on 4/24/2021, answer due 5/17/2021, filed.(Danaher, Philip)
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Rene Salazar served on 4/24/2021, answer due 5/17/2021, filed.(Danaher, Philip)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to 1.)Rosa Espinoza, 2.) Ciro Hernandez, 3.) Dina Edith Hernandez, 4.) Rene Salazar, 5.) United States of America on behalf of the Internal Revenue Service, 6.) U.S. Attorney General, 7.) U.S. Attorney. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/13/2021 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Rosa Espinoza, Ciro Hernandez, Dina Edith Hernandez, Rene Salazar, United States of America on behalf of the Internal Revenue Service, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wilmington Trust, National Association, not in its individual capacity, but solely as Trustee of BRAVO Residential Funding Trust 2019-2, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rosa Espinoza, Ciro Hernandez, Dina Edith Hernandez, Rene Salazar, United States of America on behalf of the Internal Revenue Service (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26310768) filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, not in its individual capacity, but solely as Trustee of BRAVO Residential Funding Trust 2019-2. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Trust, National Association et al v. Salazar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Espinoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dina Edith Hernandez
Represented By: Angela P Nix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ciro Hernandez
Represented By: Angela P Nix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association, not in its individual capacity, but solely as Trustee of BRAVO Residential Funding Trust 2019-2
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association
Represented By: Philip W Danaher
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: United States of America on behalf of the Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Philip W Danaher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?