Vanguard Energy LLC v. Global Enterprise Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: Vanguard Energy LLC
Defendant: XD Ventures LLC
Counter Claimant: Global Enterprise Solutions LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00117
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rolando Olvera
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 10 COUNTERCLAIM against Vanguard Energy LLC filed by XD Ventures LLC, Global Enterprise Solutions LLC.(Blanchard, Michael)
September 30, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM under RICO, for negligent misrepresentation, and for fraud, by Global Enterprise Solutions LLC, XD Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Blanchard, Michael)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Global Enterprise Solutions LLC, XD Ventures LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blanchard, Michael)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to XD Ventures LLC served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/7/2021, filed.(Rodriguez, Edward)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Global Enterprise Solutions LLC served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021, filed.(Rodriguez, Edward)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Vanguard Energy LLC, filed.(Rodriguez, Edward)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to 1.) Global Enterprise Solutions LLC, 2.) XD Ventures LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Global Enterprise Solutions LLC, XD Ventures LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rodriguez, Edward)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/14/2021 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Rolando Olvera(Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Global Enterprise Solutions LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26842516) filed by Vanguard Energy LLC.(Rodriguez, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanguard Energy LLC v. Global Enterprise Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanguard Energy LLC
Represented By: Edward Michael Rodriguez
Represented By: Eduardo Roberto Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Global Enterprise Solutions LLC
Represented By: Michael Joshua Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XD Ventures LLC
Represented By: Michael Joshua Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?